EP2139978 - IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO LAUNDRY CLEANING COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For:CY
GB
IE
MT
Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DY / GB | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/51] | For:CY
GB
IE
MT
Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DY / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [2010/01] | For:CY
GB
IE
MT
Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DY / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COEN, Jeremy, Jonathan, Francis Unilever R & D Port Sunlight Quarry Road East Bebington, Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | 02 /
METCALFE, Kenneth Unilever R & D Port Sunlight Quarry Road East Bebington, Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | 03 /
O'KEEFFE, Joanne, Clare Unilever R & D Port Sunlight Quarry Road East Bebington, Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | [2010/01] | Representative(s) | Elliott, Peter William Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Elliott, Peter William Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08749624.6 | 21.04.2008 | [2010/01] | WO2008EP54790 | Priority number, date | GB20070007849 | 24.04.2007 Original published format: GB 0707849 | GB20070012673 | 29.06.2007 Original published format: GB 0712673 | [2010/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008129026 | Date: | 30.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2139978 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2139978 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/65, C11D1/86, C11D3/00 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
C11D1/65 (EP);
C11D1/86 (EP);
C11D3/48 (EP);
C11D1/62 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNGEN IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT WÄSCHEREINIGUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2010/01] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO LAUNDRY CLEANING COMPOSITIONS | [2010/01] | French: | AMÉLIORATION DE COMPOSITIONS NETTOYANTES DE BLANCHISSERIE | [2010/01] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/01] | 06.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.12.2010 | BE | 22.12.2010 | CY | 22.12.2010 | CZ | 22.12.2010 | DK | 22.12.2010 | EE | 22.12.2010 | FI | 22.12.2010 | HR | 22.12.2010 | HU | 22.12.2010 | LT | 22.12.2010 | LV | 22.12.2010 | MT | 22.12.2010 | NL | 22.12.2010 | PL | 22.12.2010 | RO | 22.12.2010 | SE | 22.12.2010 | SI | 22.12.2010 | SK | 22.12.2010 | BG | 22.03.2011 | NO | 22.03.2011 | GR | 23.03.2011 | IE | 21.04.2011 | LU | 21.04.2011 | IS | 22.04.2011 | PT | 22.04.2011 | MC | 30.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/25] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
MT | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
NO | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IE | 21.04.2011 | ||
LU | 21.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
MT | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
NO | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IE | 21.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
MT | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
NO | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
NO | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
NO | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
NO | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
NO | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
NO | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
NO | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
NO | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0008829 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 11, lines 21-24; example -; claim - *; | [A]US5798329 (TAYLOR TIMOTHY J [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * example -; claim - *; | [A]US2003199410 (BESSE MICHAEL E [US], et al) [A] 1-10* paragraphs [0092] - [0112]; claim -; tables 1-11 *; | [A]US2004058835 (SINGH AMRAT PAUL [GB], et al) [A] 1-10 * example -; claim - * |