EP2153372 - ELECTRICAL DEVICE HAVING A DATA CARRIER LOCKING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR UNLOCKING A DATA CARRIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [2010/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAHLER, Torsten Ziegeleistrasse, 26 78073 Bad Dürrheim / DE | [2010/13] |
Former [2010/07] | 01 /
WAHLER, Torsten Scheffelstr. 4/4 78073 Bad Dürrheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 08749750.9 | 25.04.2008 | [2010/07] | WO2008EP55095 | Priority number, date | DE20071024729 | 25.05.2007 Original published format: DE102007024729 | [2010/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008145465 | Date: | 04.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2153372 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2153372 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/00, G11B17/00, G07C5/08 | [2010/07] | CPC: |
G07C5/0858 (EP,US);
G06K13/08 (EP,US);
G06K13/0831 (EP,US);
G06K13/085 (EP,US);
G06K7/0021 (EP,US);
G11B17/0407 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49815 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/07] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHES GERÄT MIT EINER DATENTRÄGERVERRIEGELUNGSEINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ENTRIEGELN EINES DATENTRÄGERS | [2010/07] | English: | ELECTRICAL DEVICE HAVING A DATA CARRIER LOCKING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR UNLOCKING A DATA CARRIER | [2010/07] | French: | APPAREIL ELECTRIQUE MUNI D'UN SYSTEME DE VERROUILLAGE POUR SUPPORT DE DONNEES ET PROCEDE DE DEVERROUILLAGE D'UN SUPPORT DE DONNEES | [2012/34] |
Former [2010/07] | APPAREIL ÉLECTRIQUE MUNI D'UN SYSTÈME DE VERROUILLAGE POUR SUPPORT DE DONNÉES ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉVERROUILLAGE D'UN SUPPORT DE DONNÉES | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/07] | 12.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.04.2008 | CY | 02.01.2013 | CZ | 02.01.2013 | DK | 02.01.2013 | EE | 02.01.2013 | FI | 02.01.2013 | HR | 02.01.2013 | IT | 02.01.2013 | LT | 02.01.2013 | LV | 02.01.2013 | MC | 02.01.2013 | MT | 02.01.2013 | NL | 02.01.2013 | PL | 02.01.2013 | RO | 02.01.2013 | SI | 02.01.2013 | SK | 02.01.2013 | TR | 02.01.2013 | BG | 02.04.2013 | NO | 02.04.2013 | GR | 03.04.2013 | ES | 13.04.2013 | AT | 25.04.2013 | GB | 25.04.2013 | IE | 25.04.2013 | LU | 25.04.2013 | BE | 30.04.2013 | CH | 30.04.2013 | LI | 30.04.2013 | IS | 02.05.2013 | PT | 02.05.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 02.01.2013 | |
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
IT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
MC | 02.01.2013 | ||
MT | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
TR | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
AT | 25.04.2013 | ||
GB | 25.04.2013 | ||
IE | 25.04.2013 | ||
BE | 30.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | CY | 02.01.2013 | |
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
IT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
MC | 02.01.2013 | ||
MT | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
AT | 25.04.2013 | ||
GB | 25.04.2013 | ||
IE | 25.04.2013 | ||
BE | 30.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 02.01.2013 | |
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
IT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
MC | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
AT | 25.04.2013 | ||
GB | 25.04.2013 | ||
IE | 25.04.2013 | ||
BE | 30.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 02.01.2013 | |
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
IT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
MC | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
GB | 25.04.2013 | ||
IE | 25.04.2013 | ||
BE | 30.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 02.01.2013 | |
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
IT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
MC | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
GB | 25.04.2013 | ||
BE | 30.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | CY | 02.01.2013 | |
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
IT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
MC | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | CY | 02.01.2013 | |
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
IT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
MC | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/01] | CY | 02.01.2013 | |
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
MC | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 02.01.2013 | |
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | CZ | 02.01.2013 | |
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CZ | 02.01.2013 | |
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | CZ | 02.01.2013 | |
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | CZ | 02.01.2013 | |
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | CZ | 02.01.2013 | |
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CZ | 02.01.2013 | |
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | CZ | 02.01.2013 | |
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CZ | 02.01.2013 | |
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 02.01.2013 | |
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 02.01.2013 | |
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | SI | 02.01.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XA]DE20018694U (MANNESMANN VDO AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,8-16 * abstract * * page 1, line 10 - line 15 * * page 2, line 11 - line 28 * * page 3, line 11 - page 4, line 26 * * page 5, line 18 - page 9, line 23 * * page 11, line 8 - page 12, line 12 * [A] 5-7; | [A]US2005114875 (SATO TAKASHI [JP]) [A] 1-4,8-16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] , [0058] *; | [A]US2001021155 (SAITO AKIO [JP]) [A] 1,16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0093] , [0186] *; | [T]US2005034138 (YONG ZHU [CN]); | [T]US2004062173 (CHANG YEN-JEN [TW]) | by applicant | DE20018694U |