EP2149070 - VARIABLE ACOUSTO-OPTICAL FILTER ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2019 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leica Microsystems CMS GmbH CPTD Ernst-Leitz-Strasse 17-37 35578 Wetzlar / DE | [2018/15] |
Former [2010/05] | For all designated states Leica Microsystems CMS GmbH Ernst-Leitz-Strasse 17-37 35578 Wetzlar / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUGEL, Hilmar Konrad-Adenauer-Strasse 23b 69221 Dossenheim / DE | 02 /
SEYFRIED, Volker Jahnstrasse 28 69226 Nussloch / DE | [2010/05] | Representative(s) | Hassenbürger, Anneliese Leica Microsystems GmbH Corporate Patents + Trademarks Department Ernst-Leitz-Strasse 17-37 35578 Wetzlar / DE | [2018/15] |
Former [2010/05] | Hassenbürger, Anneliese Leica Microsystems GmbH Corporate Patents + Trademarks Department Ernst-Leitz-Strasse 17-37 35578 Wetzlar / DE | Application number, filing date | 08749935.6 | 30.04.2008 | [2010/05] | WO2008EP55355 | Priority number, date | DE20071024075 | 22.05.2007 Original published format: DE102007024075 | [2010/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008141903 | Date: | 27.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2149070 | Date: | 03.02.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2149070 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/11, G02B21/00 | [2010/05] | CPC: |
G02F1/116 (EP,US);
G02B21/0064 (EP,US);
G02B21/16 (EP,US);
G02B27/46 (EP,US);
G02B21/0032 (US);
G02B27/0927 (US);
G02B27/42 (US);
G02B3/0087 (US);
G02F1/00 (US);
G02F1/03 (US);
G02F1/11 (US);
G02F1/29 (US);
G02F1/33 (US);
G02F1/353 (US);
G02F2201/305 (US);
G02F2202/32 (US);
G02F2203/12 (US);
G02F2203/18 (US);
G02F2203/24 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/15] |
Former [2010/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DURCHSTIMMBARES AKUSTO-OPTISCHES FILTERELEMENT | [2010/05] | English: | VARIABLE ACOUSTO-OPTICAL FILTER ELEMENT | [2010/05] | French: | ÉLÉMENT FILTRANT ACOUSTO-OPTIQUE AJUSTABLE | [2010/05] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/05] | 11.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 26.03.2018 | Request for correction of the decision to grant filed | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.04.2008 | CY | 11.04.2018 | CZ | 11.04.2018 | EE | 11.04.2018 | FI | 11.04.2018 | HR | 11.04.2018 | IT | 11.04.2018 | LT | 11.04.2018 | LV | 11.04.2018 | MC | 11.04.2018 | MT | 11.04.2018 | NL | 11.04.2018 | PL | 11.04.2018 | RO | 11.04.2018 | SE | 11.04.2018 | SI | 11.04.2018 | SK | 11.04.2018 | TR | 11.04.2018 | AT | 30.04.2018 | BE | 30.04.2018 | CH | 30.04.2018 | IE | 30.04.2018 | LI | 30.04.2018 | LU | 30.04.2018 | BG | 11.07.2018 | NO | 11.07.2018 | GR | 12.07.2018 | IS | 11.08.2018 | PT | 13.08.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 30.04.2008 | |
CY | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
MT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
AT | 30.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
IE | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
LU | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 30.04.2008 | |
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
MT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
AT | 30.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
IE | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
LU | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CZ | 11.04.2018 | |
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
MT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
AT | 30.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
IE | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
LU | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | CZ | 11.04.2018 | |
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
MT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
AT | 30.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
IE | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
LU | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | CZ | 11.04.2018 | |
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
AT | 30.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
IE | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
LU | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | CZ | 11.04.2018 | |
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
IE | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
LU | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | CZ | 11.04.2018 | |
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
IE | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
LU | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | CZ | 11.04.2018 | |
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
LU | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CZ | 11.04.2018 | |
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
LU | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | EE | 11.04.2018 | |
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
LU | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 11.04.2018 | |
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
LU | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | FI | 11.04.2018 | |
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 11.04.2018 | |
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | FI | 11.04.2018 | |
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | FI | 11.04.2018 | |
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | FI | 11.04.2018 | |
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 11.04.2018 | |
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | NL | 11.04.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4084182 (MAIMAN THEODORE H) [X] 1,2,4-6,11,12,17,18 * column 4, line 62 - column 5, line 68 * * column 8, line 19 - line 68; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5377003 (LEWIS EDGAR N [US], et al) [A] 1,4,14,16,17,19 * column 8, line 55 - column 9, line 2 *; | [A]WO9730371 (UNIV CARNEGIE MELLON [US]) [A] 1,2,4,17-19 * page 15, line 17 - page 16, line 4; figures 1,15 * * page 17, line 23 - page 18, line 9 * * page 22, line 4 - page 23, line 21; figures 6,7 ** page 26, line 25 - page 27, line 5; figures 1,15 *; | [A]JP2003065850 (SHIKOKU RESEARCH INST INC) [A] 1,2,4,7,8,13,14,17 * abstract *; | [A]EP1141763 (ZEISS CARL JENA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2,4-6,14,19-22,24,25 * paragraph [0022] * |