|
05.08.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.08.2019 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2019 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
23.07.2019 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2019 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.2019 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.2019 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.2019 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.05.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.01.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.12.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.12.2018 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
05.12.2018 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.12.2018 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.2016 |
Communication of amended entries |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.09.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.07.2016 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.07.2016 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.07.2016 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
57 |
|
20.07.2016 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
22 |
|
28.04.2016 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2016 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.04.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.04.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.04.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.04.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.04.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.04.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.04.2016 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
25.02.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.02.2016 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2016 |
Request for correction |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.01.2016 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.01.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
11.12.2015 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2015 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.12.2015 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
11.12.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2015 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2015 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.11.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2015 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.11.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.11.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.11.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2015 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2015 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.10.2015 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.09.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.09.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
16 |
|
24.09.2015 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.09.2015 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.09.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2015 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.09.2015 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
23 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.07.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.07.2015 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.07.2015 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.05.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2015 |
Request concerning representative opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2015 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.11.2014 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.2014 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.10.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.10.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2014 |
Communication concerning statement of surrender/lapse of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.2014 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2014 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2014 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2014 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.10.2013 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2013 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2013 |
Refund of fees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2013 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2013 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
28.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
28.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
28.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
28.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
218 |
|
28.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
28.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
28.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
28.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.08.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
28.08.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.08.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
39 |
|
27.08.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.11.2012 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2012 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2012 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
16.10.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.10.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2012 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
15.10.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.10.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2012 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2012 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.06.2012 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2012 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
15.03.2011 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2010 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.2009 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.12.2009 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.12.2009 |
Refund order of filing/examination fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2009 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
10.11.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2009 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
25.09.2009 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.03.2009 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2009 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
19.06.2008 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
19.06.2008 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
19.06.2008 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
10 |
|
19.06.2008 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
2 |