EP2290674 - QUADRUPOLE MASS SPECTROMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/09] | QUADRUPOLE MASS ANALYZER | ||
[2017/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shimadzu Corporation 1, Nishinokyo-Kuwabara-cho Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 604-8511 / JP | [2016/52] |
Former [2011/09] | For all designated states Shimadzu Corporation 1, Nishinokyo-Kuwabaracho Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 604-8511 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUKAIBATAKE, Kazuo c/o Shimadzu Corporation 1 Nishinokyo-Kuwabara-cho Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 604-8511 / JP | [2017/09] |
Former [2011/09] | 01 /
MUKAIBATAKE, Kazuo c/o Shimadzu Corporation 1 Nishinokyo-Kuwabara-cho Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 604-8511 / JP | Representative(s) | Kilian Kilian & Partner mbB Zielstattstraße 23a 81379 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | Kilian Kilian & Partner Aidenbachstraße 54 81379 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/09] | Wilhelms · Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Straße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08751794.2 | 22.05.2008 | [2011/09] | WO2008JP01282 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009141852 | Date: | 26.11.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2290674 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2290674 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.11.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01J49/42 | [2011/09] | CPC: |
H01J49/4215 (EP,US);
H01J49/429 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/09] |
Former [2011/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | QUADRUPOL-MASSENSPEKTROMETER | [2017/09] | English: | QUADRUPOLE MASS SPECTROMETER | [2017/09] | French: | SPECTROMETRE À MASSE QUADRIPOLAIRE | [2017/09] |
Former [2011/09] | QUADRUPOL-MASSENANALYSATOR | ||
Former [2011/09] | QUADRUPOLE MASS ANALYZER | ||
Former [2011/09] | ANALYSEUR À MASSE QUADRUPOLAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2010 | Translation filed | 10.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2010 | Search fee paid | 10.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/09] | 02.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.06.2016 | 21.06.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 15.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16191565.7 / EP3147935 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.12.2014 | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.05.2008 | AT | 01.03.2017 | CY | 01.03.2017 | CZ | 01.03.2017 | DK | 01.03.2017 | EE | 01.03.2017 | ES | 01.03.2017 | FI | 01.03.2017 | HR | 01.03.2017 | IT | 01.03.2017 | LT | 01.03.2017 | LV | 01.03.2017 | MC | 01.03.2017 | NL | 01.03.2017 | PL | 01.03.2017 | RO | 01.03.2017 | SE | 01.03.2017 | SI | 01.03.2017 | SK | 01.03.2017 | TR | 01.03.2017 | IE | 22.05.2017 | LU | 22.05.2017 | MT | 22.05.2017 | BE | 31.05.2017 | CH | 31.05.2017 | FR | 31.05.2017 | LI | 31.05.2017 | BG | 01.06.2017 | NO | 01.06.2017 | GR | 02.06.2017 | IS | 01.07.2017 | PT | 03.07.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 22.05.2008 | |
AT | 01.03.2017 | ||
CY | 01.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
IE | 22.05.2017 | ||
LU | 22.05.2017 | ||
MT | 22.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 22.05.2008 | |
AT | 01.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
IE | 22.05.2017 | ||
LU | 22.05.2017 | ||
MT | 22.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
IE | 22.05.2017 | ||
LU | 22.05.2017 | ||
MT | 22.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
IE | 22.05.2017 | ||
LU | 22.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
IE | 22.05.2017 | ||
LU | 22.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
IE | 22.05.2017 | ||
LU | 22.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
LU | 22.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2007083403 (SHIMADZU CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2,7,9 * the whole document *; | US2010193684 [ ] (MUKAIBATAKE KAZUO [JP], et al) [ ] * paragraphs [0014] , [0015] * * paragraphs [0063] - [0077]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US3784814 (SAKAI T, et al) [Y] 1,2,7,9 * abstract * * column 5; figures 4, 5 *; | [A]US4535236 (BATEY JONATHAN H [GB]) [A] 1,2 * column 3, lines 3-23 *; | [A]US6153880 (RUSS IV CHARLES WILLIAM [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 2, lines 37-57 *; | [A] - SANDRA K ET AL, "The Q-Trap mass spectrometer, a novel tool in the study of protein glycosylation", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MASS SPECTROMETRY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE INC, US, (20040301), vol. 15, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.JASMS.2003.11.003, ISSN 1044-0305, pages 413 - 423, XP004494120 [A] 1,2 * page 414, column r * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jasms.2003.11.003 | International search | [X]JPH0294242 (SHIMADZU CORP); | [A]JPH08287866 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JP2002025498 (SHIMADZU CORP); | [A]JP2006040890 (AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES INC); | [A]JP2008052996 (SHIMADZU CORP) |