EP2157435 - NOZZLE CLEANING METHOD, NOZZLE CLEANING DEVICE, AND AUTOMATIC ANALYZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beckman Coulter, Inc. 250 S. Kraemer Boulevard Brea, CA 92821 / US | [2016/24] |
Former [2010/26] | For all designated states Beckman Coulter, Inc. 250 S. Kraemer Boulevard Brea, 92821 CA / US | ||
Former [2010/08] | For all designated states Beckman Coulter, Inc. 4300 N. Harbor Boulevard Fullerton, CA 92834 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KURODA, Akihisa c/o Beckman Coulter Biomedical K.K. 454-32, Higashino Nagaizumi-cho Sunto-gun Shizuoka 411-0931 / JP | 02 /
KOBAYASHI, Mitsuhisa c/o Beckman Coulter Biomedical K.K. 454-32, Higashino Nagaizumi-cho Sunto-gun Shizuoka 411-0931 / JP | 03 /
KASE, Yoshihiro c/o Beckman Coulter Biomedical K.K. 454-32, Higashino Nagaizumi-cho Sunto-gun Shizuoka 411-0931 / JP | 04 /
OKAWA, Tamotsu c/o Beckman Coulter Biomedical K.K. 454-32, Higashino Nagaizumi-cho Sunto-gun Shizuoka 411-0931 / JP | [2016/24] |
Former [2010/08] | 01 /
KURODA, Akihisa c/o Beckman Coulter Biomedical K.K. 454-32, Higashino Nagaizumi-cho Sunto-gun Shizuoka 411-0931 / JP | ||
02 /
KOBAYASHI, Mitsuhisa c/o Beckman Coulter Biomedical K.K. 454-32, Higashino Nagaizumi-cho Sunto-gun Shizuoka 411-0931 / JP | |||
03 /
KASE, Yoshihiro c/o Beckman Coulter Biomedical K.K. 454-32, Higashino Nagaizumi-cho Sunto-gun Shizuoka 411-0931 / JP | |||
04 /
OKAWA, Tamotsu c/o Beckman Coulter Biomedical K.K. 454-32, Higashino Nagaizumi-cho Sunto-gun Shizuoka 411-0931 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2016/24] |
Former [2010/08] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08751986.4 | 23.04.2008 | [2010/08] | WO2008JP57848 | Priority number, date | JP20070126905 | 11.05.2007 Original published format: JP 2007126905 | [2010/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008142944 | Date: | 27.11.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2157435 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2157435 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01N35/10 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
G01N35/1004 (EP,KR,US);
B01L13/02 (EP,US);
B05B15/555 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/24] |
Former [2010/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DÜSENREINIGUNGSVERFAHREN, DÜSENREINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND ANALYSEAUTOMAT | [2010/08] | English: | NOZZLE CLEANING METHOD, NOZZLE CLEANING DEVICE, AND AUTOMATIC ANALYZER | [2010/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE NETTOYAGE D'UNE BUSE, DISPOSITIF DE NETTOYAGE D'UNE BUSE ET ANALYSEUR AUTOMATIQUE | [2010/08] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2009 | Translation filed | 10.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2009 | Search fee paid | 10.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 10.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.11.2015 | 26.11.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 05.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 04.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.04.2008 | AT | 15.06.2016 | BG | 15.06.2016 | CY | 15.06.2016 | CZ | 15.06.2016 | DK | 15.06.2016 | EE | 15.06.2016 | FI | 15.06.2016 | HR | 15.06.2016 | LT | 15.06.2016 | LV | 15.06.2016 | MC | 15.06.2016 | PL | 15.06.2016 | RO | 15.06.2016 | SE | 15.06.2016 | SI | 15.06.2016 | SK | 15.06.2016 | TR | 15.06.2016 | NO | 15.09.2016 | GR | 16.09.2016 | IS | 15.10.2016 | PT | 17.10.2016 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 23.04.2008 | |
AT | 15.06.2016 | ||
BG | 15.06.2016 | ||
CY | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 23.04.2008 | |
AT | 15.06.2016 | ||
BG | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 23.04.2008 | |
AT | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 15.06.2016 | |
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 15.06.2016 | |
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 15.06.2016 | |
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 15.06.2016 | |
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 15.06.2016 | |
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 15.06.2016 | |
NO | 15.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP0472213 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]) [I] 1-8 * column 3, line 50 - column 5, line 10; figure 1 *; | [I]DE19610607 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-8* column 2, line 10 - line 50; figure 1 * | International search | [X]JPS62228954 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [X]JPS62242858 (NIPPON TECTRON KK); | [A]JPH04169851 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [X]JPH05164764 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [X]JP2002040035 (JEOL LTD); | [A]JP2004251797 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [X]JP2007093220 (HITACHI HIGH TECH CORP) |