EP2159206 - PIEZOELECTRIC CERAMIC, AND PIEZOELECTRIC, DIELECTRIC, AND PYROELECTRIC ELEMENTS USING THE PIEZOELECTRIC CERAMIC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 3-1 Kasumigaseki 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8921 / JP | [2019/16] |
Former [2010/09] | For all designated states National Institute Of Advanced Industrial Science 3-1 Kasumigaseki 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8921 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Ruiping c/o National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology Tsukuba Central 2 1-1 Umezono 1-chome Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-8568 / JP | 02 /
BANDO, Hiroshi c/o National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology Tsukuba Central 2 1-1 Umezono 1-chome Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-8568 / JP | [2019/16] |
Former [2010/09] | 01 /
WANG, Ruiping c/o National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology Tsukuba Central 2 1-1 Umezono 1-chome Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-8568 / JP | ||
02 /
BANDO, Hiroshi c/o National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology Tsukuba Central 2 1-1 Umezono 1-chome Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-8568 / JP | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/16] | Dehns St. Brides House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2010/09] | Calamita, Roberto Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 08752858.4 | 16.05.2008 | [2010/09] | WO2008JP59007 | Priority number, date | JP20070131075 | 16.05.2007 Original published format: JP 2007131075 | JP20070263955 | 10.10.2007 Original published format: JP 2007263955 | [2010/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008143160 | Date: | 27.11.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2159206 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2159206 | Date: | 17.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/495, C01G33/00, C01G35/00, H01L37/02, H01L41/187 | [2018/47] | CPC: |
C01G33/006 (EP,US);
C01G35/006 (EP,US);
C04B35/495 (EP,US);
H10N15/15 (EP,US);
H10N30/8542 (EP,US);
C01P2006/10 (EP,US);
C01P2006/40 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3201 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3203 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3206 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3208 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3213 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3215 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3224 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3225 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3227 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3229 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3232 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3239 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3241 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3244 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3258 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3267 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3281 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3286 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3287 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3293 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3298 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3418 (EP,US);
C04B2235/76 (EP,US);
C04B2235/765 (EP,US);
C04B2235/768 (EP,US);
C04B2235/77 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/50] | C04B35/00, C01G35/00, C04B35/46, C04B35/495, H01L41/187, C01G33/00, H01L37/02 | ||
Former IPC [2010/09] | C04B35/00, C01G35/00, C04B35/46, C04B35/49, H01L41/187 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/16] |
Former [2010/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | PIEZOELEKTRISCHE KERAMIK UND PIEZOELEKTRISCHE, DIELEKTRISCHE UND PYROELEKTRISCHE ELEMENTE UNTER VERWENDUNG DER PIEZOELEKTRISCHEN KERAMIK | [2010/09] | English: | PIEZOELECTRIC CERAMIC, AND PIEZOELECTRIC, DIELECTRIC, AND PYROELECTRIC ELEMENTS USING THE PIEZOELECTRIC CERAMIC | [2010/09] | French: | CÉRAMIQUE PIÉZOÉLECTRIQUE ET ÉLÉMENTS PIÉZOÉLECTRIQUES, DIÉLECTRIQUES ET PYROÉLECTRIQUES UTILISANT LA CÉRAMIQUE PIÉZOÉLECTRIQUE | [2010/09] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2009 | Translation filed | 11.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2009 | Search fee paid | 11.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/09] | 06.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.11.2018 | 26.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.05.2008 | AT | 17.04.2019 | CY | 17.04.2019 | CZ | 17.04.2019 | DK | 17.04.2019 | EE | 17.04.2019 | ES | 17.04.2019 | FI | 17.04.2019 | HR | 17.04.2019 | IT | 17.04.2019 | LT | 17.04.2019 | LV | 17.04.2019 | MC | 17.04.2019 | MT | 17.04.2019 | NL | 17.04.2019 | PL | 17.04.2019 | RO | 17.04.2019 | SE | 17.04.2019 | SI | 17.04.2019 | SK | 17.04.2019 | TR | 17.04.2019 | IE | 16.05.2019 | LU | 16.05.2019 | BE | 31.05.2019 | CH | 31.05.2019 | LI | 31.05.2019 | BG | 17.07.2019 | NO | 17.07.2019 | GR | 18.07.2019 | IS | 17.08.2019 | PT | 17.08.2019 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 16.05.2008 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CY | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IE | 16.05.2019 | ||
LU | 16.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 17.04.2019 | |
CY | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IE | 16.05.2019 | ||
LU | 16.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AT | 17.04.2019 | |
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IE | 16.05.2019 | ||
LU | 16.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AT | 17.04.2019 | |
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IE | 16.05.2019 | ||
LU | 16.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 17.04.2019 | |
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LU | 16.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 17.04.2019 | |
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
LU | 16.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 17.04.2019 | |
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
LU | 16.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 17.04.2019 | |
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 17.04.2019 | |
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | NL | 17.04.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2006117990 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP], et al) | International search | [A]JP2002255641 (KYOCERA CORP); | [Y]JP2004244300 (DENSO CORP, et al); | [X]JP2005008516 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO); | [X]WO2006117990 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP3259677B | JP3259678B | JP3282576B | JP2004300012 | JP2005502701 | JP2005513469 | JP3654408B | JP2006206429 |