EP2153605 - ORTHOGONAL FREQUENCY-DIVISION MULTIPLEXING (OFDM) TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING DEVICE FOR TRANSMISMITTING AND RECEIVING AN OFDM SYMBOL HAVING SYMBOLS INTERLEAVED VARIABLY, AND METHODS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/38] |
Former [2010/07] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Ki-bo 626-803 Naru-maeul Hanhwa Ggumegreen Apartment Bansong-dong Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-752 / KR | 02 /
LEE, June-hee 604-2102 Parkview Jeongja-dong Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-863 / KR | [2015/45] |
Former [2010/07] | 01 /
KIM, Ki-bo 626-803 Naru-maeul Hanhwa Ggumegreen Apartment Bansong-dong Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-752 / KR | ||
02 /
LEE, June-hee 604-2102 Parkview Jeongja-dong Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-863 / KR | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/45] | Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | ||
Former [2010/07] | Fearnside, Andrew Simon, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax, HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 08753274.3 | 30.04.2008 | [2010/07] | WO2008KR02474 | Priority number, date | KR20070054135 | 01.06.2007 Original published format: KR 20070054135 | [2010/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008147053 | Date: | 04.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2153605 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2153605 | Date: | 04.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26, H04L1/00, H04L5/00 | [2013/47] | CPC: |
H04L5/0044 (EP);
H04L27/26 (KR);
H04L1/0071 (EP);
H04L5/0007 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/07] | H04L27/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/45] |
Former [2010/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | OFDM (MULTIPLEXING MIT ORTHOGONALER FREQUENZTEILUNG)-SENDE- UND EMPFANGSVORRICHTUNG ZUM SENDEN UND EMPFANGEN EINES OFDM-SYMBOLS MIT VARIABEL ÜBERLAPPENDEN SYMBOLEN UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2010/07] | English: | ORTHOGONAL FREQUENCY-DIVISION MULTIPLEXING (OFDM) TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING DEVICE FOR TRANSMISMITTING AND RECEIVING AN OFDM SYMBOL HAVING SYMBOLS INTERLEAVED VARIABLY, AND METHODS THEREOF | [2010/07] | French: | ÉMETTEUR ET RÉCEPTEUR POUR MULTIPLEXAGE À RÉPARTITION ORTHOGONALE DE LA FRÉQUENCE (MROF) POUR L'ÉMISSION ET LA RÉCEPTION D'UN SYMBOLE MROF POSSÉDANT DES SYMBOLES ENTRELACÉS DE FAÇON VARIABLE, ET PROCÉDÉS CORRESPONDANTS | [2010/07] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2009 | Examination requested [2010/07] | 13.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 05.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.04.2008 | AT | 04.11.2015 | BE | 04.11.2015 | BG | 04.11.2015 | CY | 04.11.2015 | CZ | 04.11.2015 | DK | 04.11.2015 | EE | 04.11.2015 | ES | 04.11.2015 | FI | 04.11.2015 | HR | 04.11.2015 | IT | 04.11.2015 | LT | 04.11.2015 | LV | 04.11.2015 | MC | 04.11.2015 | NL | 04.11.2015 | PL | 04.11.2015 | RO | 04.11.2015 | SE | 04.11.2015 | SI | 04.11.2015 | SK | 04.11.2015 | TR | 04.11.2015 | NO | 04.02.2016 | GR | 05.02.2016 | IS | 04.03.2016 | PT | 04.03.2016 | CH | 30.04.2016 | IE | 30.04.2016 | LI | 30.04.2016 | LU | 30.04.2016 | MT | 30.04.2016 | FR | 02.05.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 30.04.2008 | |
AT | 04.11.2015 | ||
BE | 04.11.2015 | ||
CY | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
TR | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
IE | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
LU | 30.04.2016 | ||
MT | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 30.04.2008 | |
AT | 04.11.2015 | ||
BE | 04.11.2015 | ||
CY | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
TR | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
IE | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
LU | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 30.04.2008 | |
AT | 04.11.2015 | ||
BE | 04.11.2015 | ||
CY | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
IE | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
LU | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
BE | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
IE | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
LU | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
BE | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
LU | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
BE | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
LU | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
BE | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
LU | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
BE | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 04.11.2015 | |
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 04.11.2015 | |
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 04.11.2015 | |
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 04.11.2015 | |
LT | 04.11.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US6377566 (CUPO ROBERT LOUIS [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * column 2, line 7 - column 5, line 29 * * column 5, line 66 - column 8, line 43 *; | [A]WO2006060780 (INTEL CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0018] - [0028] *; | [A]EP1612980 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0027] - [0041] *; | [AP]EP1801992 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [AP] 1-15 * paragraphs [0003] - [0005] - [0 16] - [0045] * | International search | [A]JP2005269670 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]US6278685 (YONGE III LAWRENCE W [US], et al) | [A] - LEI S.W. AND LAU V.K.N., "Adaptive Interleaving for OFDm in TDD systems", COMMUNICATIONS, IEE PROCEEDINGS, (200104), vol. 148, no. 2, pages 77 - 80, XP001058806 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/ip-com:20010071 |