EP2155118 - METAPHYSEAL HIP PROSTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biomet UK Limited Waterton Industrial Estate Bridgend South Wales CF31 3XA / GB | [2017/02] |
Former [2012/46] | For all designated states Biomet UK Limited Waterton Industrial Estate Bridgend South Wales CF31 3XA / GB | ||
Former [2010/48] | For all designated states Emad Beheer B.V. Mozartlaan 12 4702 HL Roosendaal / NL | ||
Former [2010/08] | For all designated states Hoffman, Erik Leonard Mozartlaan 12 4702 HL Roosendaal / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoffman, Erik Leonard Mozartlaan 12 4702 HL Roosendaal / NL | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/08] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Mays, Julie, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London, EC1A 4HD / GB | [2017/02] |
Former [2012/33] | Giles, Ashley Simon Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | ||
Former [2010/08] | Verhees, Godefridus Josephus Maria Brabants Octrooibureau B.V. De Pinckart 54 5674 CC Nuenen / NL | Application number, filing date | 08753759.3 | 08.05.2008 | [2010/08] | WO2008NL50276 | Priority number, date | NL20072000639 | 09.05.2007 Original published format: NL 2000639 | [2010/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008140306 | Date: | 20.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2155118 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2155118 | Date: | 11.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/30, A61F2/46, A61F2/36 | [2016/31] | CPC: |
A61F2/36 (EP,US);
A61F2/30767 (EP,US);
A61F2/3601 (EP,US);
A61F2/3662 (EP,US);
A61F2/367 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30332 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30589 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30606 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30738 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30827 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3625 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3631 (EP,US);
A61F2002/365 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3686 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4631 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/08] | A61F2/32, A61F2/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/02] |
Former [2010/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | METAPHYSEALE HÜFTPROTHESE | [2016/31] | English: | METAPHYSEAL HIP PROSTHESIS | [2010/08] | French: | PROTHÈSE DE HANCHE MÉTAPHYSAIRE | [2010/08] |
Former [2010/08] | METAPHYSEN-HÜFTPROTHESE | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 12.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/51] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.07.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 21.07.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.08.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.05.2008 | AT | 11.01.2017 | CY | 11.01.2017 | CZ | 11.01.2017 | DK | 11.01.2017 | EE | 11.01.2017 | ES | 11.01.2017 | FI | 11.01.2017 | HR | 11.01.2017 | LT | 11.01.2017 | LV | 11.01.2017 | MC | 11.01.2017 | NL | 11.01.2017 | PL | 11.01.2017 | RO | 11.01.2017 | SE | 11.01.2017 | SI | 11.01.2017 | SK | 11.01.2017 | TR | 11.01.2017 | BG | 11.04.2017 | NO | 11.04.2017 | GR | 12.04.2017 | LU | 08.05.2017 | MT | 08.05.2017 | IS | 11.05.2017 | PT | 11.05.2017 | BE | 31.05.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 08.05.2008 | |
AT | 11.01.2017 | ||
CY | 11.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LU | 08.05.2017 | ||
MT | 08.05.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 08.05.2008 | |
AT | 11.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LU | 08.05.2017 | ||
MT | 08.05.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LU | 08.05.2017 | ||
MT | 08.05.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LU | 08.05.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LU | 08.05.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2627569 (FRIEDRICHSFELD GMBH) [A] 1-10 * figure .; claim - *; | [A]US4661112 (MUELLER MAURICE E [CH]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 50; figure 1; claim - *; | [A]WO9511640 (HOWMEDICA [US]) [A] 1-10 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE4428099 (MOOS NORBERT DR [DE]) [A] 1-10 * column 5, lines 7-23; figures 1,3; claim - *; | [A]WO9842279 (LINK WALDEMAR GMBH CO [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 4,5; claim - *; | [A]EP1175876 (DRAENERT KLAUS [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figure 1; claim - *; | [A]FR2814060 (BALAY BRUNO [FR]) [A] 1-10* figures 1-3; claim - *; | [X]US6695884 (TOWNLEY CHARLES O [US]) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0045] , [0046]; figures 15,16 * | Examination | DE2331728 | US4881536 | EP0867160 | EP1106143 | US6332896 | WO02100302 |