EP2156221 - GRAVITY AZIMUTH MEASUREMENT AT A NON-ROTATING HOUSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Services Pétroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | For all designated states Schlumberger Holdings Limited Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola 1110 / VG | For all designated states Schlumberger Technology B.V. Parkstraat 83-89 2514 JG The Hague / NL | For all designated states Prad Research and Development Limited Craigmuir Chambers Road Town 1110 Tortola / VG | [2016/17] |
Former [2012/52] | For all designated states Services Petroliers Schlumberger 42 rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Schlumberger Holdings Limited Craigmuir Chambers Road Town 1110 Tortola / VG | |||
For all designated states Schlumberger Technology B.V. Parkstraat 83-89 2514 JG The Hague / NL | |||
For all designated states Prad Research and Development Limited Craigmuir Chambers Road Town 1110 Tortola / VG | |||
Former [2010/08] | For all designated states Smith International, Inc. 1310 Rankin Road Houston, TX 77073 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUGIURA, Junichi One Hermann Museum Circle, no. 3083 Houston, TX 77004 / US | [2010/16] |
Former [2010/08] | 01 /
SUGIURA, Junichi 4400 Memorial Drive 3107 Houston, TX 77007 / US | Representative(s) | Davies, Gregory Mark Murgitroyd & Company Cardiff Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/17] | Davies, Gregory Mark Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 7th Floor Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | ||
Former [2011/32] | Davies, Gregory Mark Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 7th Floor Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | ||
Former [2010/08] | Lamb, Richard Andrew Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP New Priestgate House 57 Priestgate Peterborough Cambridgeshire PE1 1JX / GB | Application number, filing date | 08754585.1 | 20.05.2008 | [2010/08] | WO2008US06469 | Priority number, date | US20070805213 | 22.05.2007 Original published format: US 805213 | [2010/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008147505 | Date: | 04.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2156221 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2156221 | Date: | 27.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01V3/18 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
E21B47/022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/17] |
Former [2010/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SCHWERKRAFTAZIMUTMESSUNG AN EINEM NICHT ROTIERENDEN GEHÄUSE | [2010/08] | English: | GRAVITY AZIMUTH MEASUREMENT AT A NON-ROTATING HOUSING | [2010/08] | French: | MESURE D'AZIMUT PAR GRAVITÉ AU NIVEAU D'UN CORPS NON ROTATIF | [2010/08] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2009 | Search fee paid | 22.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 10.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.05.2008 | AT | 27.04.2016 | BE | 27.04.2016 | BG | 27.04.2016 | CY | 27.04.2016 | CZ | 27.04.2016 | DK | 27.04.2016 | EE | 27.04.2016 | ES | 27.04.2016 | FI | 27.04.2016 | HR | 27.04.2016 | IS | 27.04.2016 | IT | 27.04.2016 | LT | 27.04.2016 | LV | 27.04.2016 | MC | 27.04.2016 | NL | 27.04.2016 | PL | 27.04.2016 | RO | 27.04.2016 | SE | 27.04.2016 | SI | 27.04.2016 | SK | 27.04.2016 | TR | 27.04.2016 | IE | 20.05.2016 | LU | 20.05.2016 | CH | 31.05.2016 | LI | 31.05.2016 | MT | 31.05.2016 | FR | 27.06.2016 | GB | 27.07.2016 | NO | 27.07.2016 | GR | 28.07.2016 | PT | 29.08.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 20.05.2008 | |
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
TR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IE | 20.05.2016 | ||
LU | 20.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
FR | 27.06.2016 | ||
GB | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 20.05.2008 | |
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
TR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IE | 20.05.2016 | ||
LU | 20.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
FR | 27.06.2016 | ||
GB | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 20.05.2008 | |
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
IE | 20.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
FR | 27.06.2016 | ||
GB | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
IE | 20.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
FR | 27.06.2016 | ||
GB | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 27.04.2016 | |
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 27.04.2016 | |
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/44] | NL | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/37] | BE | 31.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6937023 (MCELHINNEY GRAHAM [GB]) [A] 1-16 * column 13, line 44 - column 14, line 48 * * column 15, line 62 - column 16, line 16 * * figures 1-5 *; | [X]US2005269082 (BARON EMILIO A [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0048] * * figures 1,2,4,6 *; | [AD]US7080460 (ILLFELDER HERBERT M J [US]) [AD] 1-16 * claims 27-29 ** figures 1-2 * | International search | [A]US6691804 (HARRISON WILLIAM H [US]); | [X]US2005189946 (MOORE ROBERT A [US]); | [Y]US7143521 (HAUGLAND SAMUEL MARK [US]) |