EP2132938 - EFFICIENT VIDEO BLOCK MODE CHANGES IN SECOND PASS VIDEO CODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR Updated state(s): MT | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated Attn: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2015/24] |
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated Attn: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Peisong 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 02 /
BHAMIDIPATI, Phanikumar 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 03 /
SUBRAMANIAN, Sitaraman Ganapathy 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 04 /
ROHATGI, Amit 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 05 /
OGUZ, Seyfullah Halit 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 06 /
SWAZEY, Scott T. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2009/51] | Representative(s) | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm, et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstraße 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/24] | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm, et al Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstraße 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/51] | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm, et al WAGNER & GEYER Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08754842.6 | 29.02.2008 | [2009/51] | WO2008US55553 | Priority number, date | US20070892804P | 02.03.2007 Original published format: US 892804 P | US20070777395 | 13.07.2007 Original published format: US 777395 | [2009/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008109471 | Date: | 12.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2132938 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2132938 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/109, H04N19/124, H04N19/194, H04N19/176 | [2014/51] | CPC: |
H04N19/194 (EP,US);
H04N19/103 (KR);
H04N19/109 (EP,US);
H04N19/124 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/176 (EP,US);
H04N19/51 (KR);
H04N19/147 (EP,US);
H04N19/15 (EP,US);
H04N19/164 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/51] | H04N7/26, H04N7/50 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/24] |
Former [2009/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | EFFIZIENTE VIDEOBLOCK-MODUSÄNDERUNG IN EINER SECOND-PASS-VIDEOKODIERUNG | [2009/51] | English: | EFFICIENT VIDEO BLOCK MODE CHANGES IN SECOND PASS VIDEO CODING | [2009/51] | French: | CHANGEMENTS EFFICACES DE MODE DE BLOCS VIDÉO DANS LE CODAGE VIDÉO DE DEUXIÈME PASSAGE | [2009/51] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/51] | 28.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.11.2014 | 18.11.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 05.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | 11.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.02.2008 | AT | 10.06.2015 | BE | 10.06.2015 | CY | 10.06.2015 | CZ | 10.06.2015 | DK | 10.06.2015 | EE | 10.06.2015 | ES | 10.06.2015 | FI | 10.06.2015 | HR | 10.06.2015 | IT | 10.06.2015 | LT | 10.06.2015 | LV | 10.06.2015 | MC | 10.06.2015 | NL | 10.06.2015 | PL | 10.06.2015 | RO | 10.06.2015 | SE | 10.06.2015 | SI | 10.06.2015 | SK | 10.06.2015 | TR | 10.06.2015 | BG | 10.09.2015 | NO | 10.09.2015 | GR | 11.09.2015 | IS | 10.10.2015 | PT | 12.10.2015 | CH | 29.02.2016 | FR | 29.02.2016 | IE | 29.02.2016 | LI | 29.02.2016 | LU | 29.02.2016 | MT | 29.02.2016 | [2018/31] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 29.02.2008 | |
AT | 10.06.2015 | ||
BE | 10.06.2015 | ||
CY | 10.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
HR | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
MT | 10.06.2015 | ||
NL | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SE | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
FR | 29.02.2016 | ||
IE | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
LU | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
BE | 10.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
MT | 10.06.2015 | ||
NL | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SE | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
FR | 29.02.2016 | ||
IE | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
LU | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
BE | 10.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
FR | 29.02.2016 | ||
IE | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
LU | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
BE | 10.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
IE | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
LU | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
BE | 10.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
LU | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
LU | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/43] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
LU | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 10.06.2015 | |
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 10.06.2015 | |
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 10.06.2015 | |
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US2004114817 (JAYANT NIKIL [US], et al) [X] 1,6,7,9,14,15,17,22,23,25,30,31 * abstract * * paragraphs [0022] , [0023] , [0035] , [0055] , [0113] - [0126] - [0158] , [0170] , [0202] - [0234] - [27337] - [0341] * * paragraphs [0388] - [0396] * [A] 2-5,8,10-13,16,18-21,24,26-29,32; | [XA]EP1549074 (INST COMPUTING TECH CN ACADEMY [CN]) [X] 1,2,6,7,9,10,14,15,17,18,22,23,25,26,30,31 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0005] , [0009] - [0016] * [A] 3-5,8,11-13,16,19-21,24,27-29,32; | [X]EP1379090 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1-32 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0010] , [0015] , [0045] , [0046] , [0059] , [0060] , [0064] - [0082] *; | [XA]US2006050786 (TANIZAWA AKIYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,6,7,9,14,15,17,22,23,25,30,31 * abstract * * paragraphs [0017] , [0057] , [0064] - [0073] - [0082] * [A] 2-5,8,10-13,16,18-21,24,26-29,32; | [A]US2006193385 (YIN PENG [US], et al) [A] 3-5,8,11-13,16,19-21,24,27-29,32 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0017] , [0023] *; | [A] - GRECOS C ET AL, "Fast Inter Mode Prediction for P Slices in the H264 Video Coding Standard", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BROADCASTING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20050601), vol. 51, no. 2, ISSN 0018-9316, pages 256 - 263, XP011132561 [A] 3-5,8,11-13,16,19-21,24,27-29,32 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TBC.2005.846192 | Examination | US2003215011 |