EP2148580 - COMPOSITIONS AND APPROACHES FOR INCREASING DIET INDUCED THERMOGENESIS, INDUCING WEIGHT LOSS AND MAINTAINING MUSCLES MASS AND STRENGTH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.2011 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.10.2011 [2011/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HealthSpan Solutions, LLC 4301 West Markham Street Slot 801 Little Rock, Arkansas 72205 / US | [2010/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOLFE, Robert, R. 62 Ducliar Ct. Little Rock, AR 72223 / US | [2010/05] | Representative(s) | Casbon, Paul Richard Lucas & Co 135 Westhall Road Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/05] | Casbon, Paul Richard Lucas & Co, 135 Westhall Road Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08754947.3 | 28.04.2008 | [2010/05] | WO2008US61789 | Priority number, date | US20070914073P | 26.04.2007 Original published format: US 914073 P | US20080110016 | 25.04.2008 Original published format: US 110016 | [2010/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008134645 | Date: | 06.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2148580 | Date: | 03.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/305, A23L1/00, A61K31/195 | [2010/05] | CPC: |
A61K31/60 (EP,US);
A23L33/175 (EP,US);
A61K31/195 (EP,US);
A61K31/4172 (EP,US);
A61K31/4188 (EP,US);
A61K31/522 (EP,US);
A61K31/5375 (EP,US);
A61K36/752 (EP,US);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K36/752, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/30, A23V2200/332 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/05] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERSTÄRKUNG VON ERNÄHRUNGSINDUZIERTER THERMOGENESE, INDUZIERUNG VON GEWICHTSVERLUST UND BEWAHRUNG VON MUSKELMASSE UND -STÄRKE | [2010/05] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND APPROACHES FOR INCREASING DIET INDUCED THERMOGENESIS, INDUCING WEIGHT LOSS AND MAINTAINING MUSCLES MASS AND STRENGTH | [2010/05] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET APPROCHES PERMETTANT D'AUGMENTER LA THERMOGENÈSE INDUITE PAR L'ALIMENTATION, D'INDUIRE LA PERTE DE POIDS ET DE MAINTENIR LA MASSE ET LA FORCE DES MUSCLES | [2010/05] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2009 | Search fee paid | 23.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/05] | 17.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/42] | 20.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2011 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB1263336 (MORTON NORWICH PRODUCTS INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5-7 * claims 1-32 * [Y] 4,8-12; | [XY]US3697287 (WINITZ MILTON) [X] 1-3,5-7 * columns 7-10 * * examples I-VIII * [Y] 4,8-12; | [XY]US4042687 (GANS ARNOLD M, et al) [X] 1-3,5-11 * examples 1, 4 * * claims 1-4 * [Y] 4,12; | [XY]WO9934813 (MACKENZIE WALSER [US]) [X] 1-3,5-7 * the whole document * [Y] 4,8-12; | [XY]EP0983726 (RIKEN [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5-11 * paragraphs [0015] , [0026] * * claims 1, 2 * [Y] 4,12; | [XY]US2001039264 (ABE TAKASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5-11 * paragraphs [0019] - [0026] * * claim 5 * [Y] 4,12; | [XY]WO03070276 (REMEDAL OY [FI], et al) [X] 1-3,5-11 * page 5, line 16 - page 6, line 14 * * claims 1-3 * [Y] 4,12; | [XY]EP1402788 (RIKEN [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5-11 * paragraphs [0007] - [0018] * * claims 1-10 * [Y] 4,12; | [XY]WO2004026294 (NOVARTIS NUTRITION AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-3,5-11 * page 5, line 15 - line 34 * * page 13, line 7 - line 14 * * examples 1-6 * * claims 1-20 * [Y] 4,12; | [XY]WO2005021596 (TECHNICAL SOURCING INTERNATION [US]) [X] 1-3,5-11 * page 15 - page 30 * [Y] 4,12; | [XY]EP1629840 (RIKEN [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5-11 * claims 1-17 * * paragraph [0016] * [Y] 4,12; | [XPY]WO2007051134 (HILLS PET NUTRITION INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-3,5-7 * claims 1-20 * [Y] 4,8-12; | [E]EP2067411 (PAOLO ODDENINO PARIS S R L [IT]) [E] 1-3,5-11 * claims 1-9 *; | [X] - ENG J ET AL, "ISOLATION AND CHARACTERIZATION OF EXENDIN-4, AND EXENDIN-3 ANALOGUE, FROM HELODERMA SUSPECTUM VENOM", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, INC, US, (19920415), vol. 267, no. 11, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 7402 - 7405, XP002045293 [X] 13 * figure 2 * | International search | [X]US5859051 (ADAMS ALAN D [US], et al); | [X]US6664230 (FOGELMAN ALAN M [US], et al); | [X]US2006094693 (AZIZ NAZNEEN [US], et al); | [X]US2006280840 (ROBERTSON MARION G [US]) |