EP2155036 - VISUAL ELECTRODE ABLATION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS, MT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intuitive Surgical Operations, Inc. 1266 Kifer Road Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | [2015/50] |
Former [2010/08] | For all designated states Voyage Medical, Inc. 610 Galveston Drive Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILLIS, N. Parker 98 Reservoir Road Atherton, California 94027 / US | 02 /
MALCHANO, Zachary J. 417 Missouri Street San Francisco, California 94107 / US | 03 /
ROTHE, Chris A. 1975 Playa Street San Mateo, California 94403 / US | 04 /
SAADAT, Vahid 75 Barry Lane Atherton, California 94027 / US | 05 /
PEH, Ruey-Feng Block 656 Choa Chu Kang Cres No. 10-17 Singapore 680656 / SG | 06 /
MILLER, David 10050 Firwood Drive Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 07 /
TAM, Edmund 707 Continental Circle, 1811 Mountain View, California 94040 / US | [2016/08] |
Former [2010/30] | 01 /
WILLIS, N. Parker 98 Reservoir Road Atherton, California 94027 / US | ||
02 /
MALCHANO, Zachary J. 417 Missouri Street San Francisco, California 94107 / US | |||
03 /
ROTHE, Chris A. 1975 Playa Street San Mateo, California 94403 / US | |||
04 /
SAADAT, Vahid 75 Barry Lane Atherton, California 94027 / US | |||
05 /
PEH, Ruey-Feng Block 656 Choa Chu Kang Cres No. 10-17 Singapore 680656 / SG | |||
06 /
MILLER, David 10050 Firwood Drive Cupertino, California 95014 / US | |||
07 /
TAM, Edmund 707 Continental Circle, 1811 Mountain View, California 94040 / US | |||
Former [2010/08] | 01 /
WILLIS, N. Parker 98 Reservoir Road Atherton, California 94027 / US | ||
02 /
MALCHANO, Zachary J. 417 Missouri Street San Francisco, California 94107 / US | |||
03 /
ROTHE, Chris A. 1975 Playa Street San Mateo, California 94403 / US | |||
04 /
SAADAT, Vahid 75 Barry Lane Atherton, California 94027 / US | |||
05 /
PEH, Ruey-Feng 707 Continental Circle 1811 Mountain View, California 94040 / US | |||
06 /
MILLER, David 10050 Firwood Drive Cupertino, California 95014 / US | |||
07 /
TAM, Edmund 707 Continental Circle, 1811 Mountain View, California 94040 / US | Representative(s) | Price, Nigel John King J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2016/08] |
Former [2010/08] | Price, Nigel John King J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08755266.7 | 09.05.2008 | [2010/08] | WO2008US63324 | Priority number, date | US20070917487P | 11.05.2007 Original published format: US 917487 P | [2010/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008141238 | Date: | 20.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2155036 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2155036 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, A61B1/008, A61B18/14 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
A61B18/1492 (EP,US);
A61B1/00089 (EP,US);
A61B1/012 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00106 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00214 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00577 (US);
A61B2018/00642 (US);
A61B2018/00809 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00839 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/08] |
Former [2010/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VISUELLE ELEKTRODENABLATIONSSYSTEME | [2010/08] | English: | VISUAL ELECTRODE ABLATION SYSTEMS | [2010/08] | French: | SYSTÈMES D'ABLATION PAR ÉLECTRODE VISUELS | [2010/08] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2009 | Search fee paid | 07.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 16.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15201701.8 / EP3025636 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   30.10.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.05.2008 | AT | 24.02.2016 | BE | 24.02.2016 | CY | 24.02.2016 | CZ | 24.02.2016 | DK | 24.02.2016 | EE | 24.02.2016 | ES | 24.02.2016 | FI | 24.02.2016 | HR | 24.02.2016 | IS | 24.02.2016 | LT | 24.02.2016 | LV | 24.02.2016 | MC | 24.02.2016 | NL | 24.02.2016 | PL | 24.02.2016 | RO | 24.02.2016 | SE | 24.02.2016 | SI | 24.02.2016 | SK | 24.02.2016 | TR | 24.02.2016 | IE | 09.05.2016 | LU | 09.05.2016 | BG | 24.05.2016 | NO | 24.05.2016 | GR | 25.05.2016 | CH | 31.05.2016 | LI | 31.05.2016 | MT | 31.05.2016 | PT | 24.06.2016 | [2018/32] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 09.05.2008 | |
AT | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CY | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MC | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
TR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IE | 09.05.2016 | ||
LU | 09.05.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 09.05.2008 | |
AT | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CY | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MC | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
IE | 09.05.2016 | ||
LU | 09.05.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
IE | 09.05.2016 | ||
LU | 09.05.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
LU | 09.05.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
LU | 09.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
LU | 09.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 24.02.2016 | |
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2006184048 (SAADAT VAHID [US]) [X] 1-9,11,14,15 * paragraphs [0078] - [0130]; figures 3A-3B, 8B, 32A-32B; claims 1,2,8,31-32,36-37 * [Y] 10,12 [I] 13; | [Y]US2006030844 (KNIGHT BRADLEY P [US], et al) [Y] 10,12 * paragraph [0033] * | International search | [X]US2006184048 (SAADAT VAHID [US]); | [Y]US2006030844 (KNIGHT BRADLEY P [US], et al) |