EP2164759 - CELLULAR CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITB Packaging 134 Rivers Hills Drive Holland MI 49424 / US | [2012/09] |
Former [2012/08] | For all designated states Production Assembly Service, Inc. 16935 Riley Street Holland MI 49424 / US | ||
Former [2010/12] | For all designated states Holland Awning CO., D/B/A Integrated Fabric Resource 10875 Chicago Drive Zeeland, MI 49464 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WESTRATE, Colton 10683 James Street Zeeland, MI 49464 / US | 02 /
KORTMAN, Calvin 134 River Hills Drive Holland, MI 49424 / US | 03 /
PIESKO, Jim 208 Woodwind Drive Holland, MI 49424 / US | [2010/12] | Representative(s) | Lang, Christian, et al LangPatent Anwaltskanzlei IP Law Firm Ingolstädter Straße 5 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | Lang, Christian, et al LangRaible GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rosenheimerstrasse 139 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/12] | Lang, Christian, et al IP Law Firm LangRaible Herzog-Wilhelm-Straße 22 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08755550.4 | 15.05.2008 | [2010/12] | WO2008US63720 | Priority number, date | US20070938045P | 15.05.2007 Original published format: US 938045 P | [2010/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008144400 | Date: | 27.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2164759 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2164759 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.01.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/36, B65D5/48, B65D6/18 | [2010/12] | CPC: |
B65D37/00 (EP,US);
B65D5/36 (KR);
B65D25/04 (KR);
B65D5/3621 (EP,US);
B65D5/48 (KR);
B65D5/4803 (EP,US);
B65D7/24 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/12] | Title | German: | ZELLENFÖRMIGES BEHÄLTNIS | [2010/12] | English: | CELLULAR CONTAINER | [2010/12] | French: | CONTENEUR CELLULAIRE | [2010/12] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2009 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/12] | 27.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.05.2008 | BE | 13.06.2012 | CY | 13.06.2012 | CZ | 13.06.2012 | DK | 13.06.2012 | EE | 13.06.2012 | FI | 13.06.2012 | HR | 13.06.2012 | LT | 13.06.2012 | LV | 13.06.2012 | MC | 13.06.2012 | MT | 13.06.2012 | RO | 13.06.2012 | SE | 13.06.2012 | SI | 13.06.2012 | SK | 13.06.2012 | TR | 13.06.2012 | BG | 13.09.2012 | NO | 13.09.2012 | GR | 14.09.2012 | ES | 24.09.2012 | IS | 13.10.2012 | PT | 15.10.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | BE | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
MC | 13.06.2012 | ||
MT | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
TR | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2015/13] | BE | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
MC | 13.06.2012 | ||
MT | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/03] | BE | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
MC | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | BE | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | BE | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | BE | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | BE | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | BE | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | BE | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | BE | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 13.06.2012 | |
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 13.06.2012 | |
NO | 13.09.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US3044679 (WHEELER DONALD B, et al) [X] 17 * column 1, paragraph l - column 3, line 44; figures 1,3,5,6 *[I] 16; | [I]US3184143 (LAWRENCE KOTOWICK JOSEPH) [I] 1-15 * column 3, line 31 - line 71; figures 1,3,4,7 * | International search | [X]JPS51111424U ; | [A]JPS5230368U ; | [X]JPS56103419U ; | [A]KR850000881B (SHIN JONG JA [KR]); | [Y]KR200164152Y (SAMIL COLOR PACK CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]JP2004224389 (UBE FILM KK, et al) |