EP2167780 - ROTARY DRILL BIT WITH GAGE PADS HAVING IMPROVED STEERABILITY AND REDUCED WEAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.12.2016 [2016/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. 10200 Bellaire Boulevard Houston, TX 77072-5299 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/13] | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. 10200 Bellaire Boulevard Houston, TX 77072-5299 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Shilin 34 West Prairie Dawn Circle The Woodlands, Texas 77385 / US | 02 /
ASHLIE, Riun 72 Ranchero Rise NW Calgary, Alberta T3G1E2 / CA | [2010/13] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/13] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08756292.2 | 27.05.2008 | [2010/13] | WO2008US64862 | Priority number, date | US20070940906P | 30.05.2007 Original published format: US 940906 P | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008150765 | Date: | 11.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2167780 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E21B10/28 | [2010/13] | CPC: |
E21B17/1092 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/13] | Title | German: | DREHBOHRMEISSEL MIT KALIBRIEREINSÄTZEN MIT VERBESSERTER LENKBARKEIT UND VERRINGERTEM VERSCHLEISS | [2010/13] | English: | ROTARY DRILL BIT WITH GAGE PADS HAVING IMPROVED STEERABILITY AND REDUCED WEAR | [2010/13] | French: | TRÉPAN ROTATIF AVEC TAMPONS DE CALIBRE AYANT UNE CAPACITÉ DE DIRECTION AMÉLIORÉE ET UNE USURE RÉDUITE | [2010/13] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2009 | Search fee paid | 22.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/13] | 25.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3336992 (WHITE VAN R) [X] 1,10,12 * figures 6-8 *; | [XI]US3915246 (SHESHTAWY ADEL E) [X] 1,3-5,14,15 * figures 1-3 * [I] 2,16; | [X]EP0178709 (DIAMANT BOART SA [BE]) [X] 6-9 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0269400 (REED TOOL CO [GB]) [A] 10-13* figures 1-2 *; | [X]US4776411 (JONES KENNETH W [US]) [X] 1 * figures 1-2 *; | [A]CN2051278U (REN JUN [CN]) [A] 10-13 * figure 1 *; | [XI]EP0530045 (CAMCO DRILLING GROUP LTD [GB]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 17, line 3 - line 7 * * figures 16,23-27 * [I] 4; | [X]US5755297 (YOUNG JOHN RANDOLPH [US], et al) [X] 6,8 * figures 1-2 *; | [X]WO9834007 (WEATHERFORD LAMB [US], et al) [X] 1 * figures 11A,11C,12B *; | [A]US6112836 (SPAAR JOHN R [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 17 - line 23 * * column 4, line 42 - line 47 *; | [X]US6123160 (TIBBITTS GORDON A [US]) [X] 3 * figures 10-11 *; | [A]US6206117 (TIBBITTS GORDON A [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 22 - line 31 * * column 3, line 19 - line 40 *; | [Y]US2001047888 (WOOD ROY W [US]) [Y] 6,8 * figure 1 *; | [X]US6349780 (BEUERSHAUSEN CHRISTOPHER C [US]) [X] 3 * column 15, line 22 - line 31 * * figures 9A-9B *; | [A]EP1283324 (SMITH INTERNATIONAL [US]) [A] 10-13 * figure 6 *; | [A]US6527065 (TIBBITTS GORDON A [US], et al) [A] 10-13 * figure 3 *; | [Y]CN2625558Y (KINGDREAM PLC [CN]) [Y] 6,8 * figures 1,5 *; | [A]EP1627985 (REEDHYCALOG UK LTD [GB]) [A] 10-13 * figure 6e *; | [X]US2006213691 (BARTON STEVEN P [US], et al) [X] 6-9 * figures 8-9 * | International search | [Y]US3269470 (KELLY JR JOSEPH L); | [Y]US5967247 (PESSIER RUDOLF C O [US]); | [A]US6123160 (TIBBITTS GORDON A [US]); | [Y]US6138780 (BEUERSHAUSEN CHRISTOPHER C [US]); | [A]US6302223 (SINOR L ALLEN [US]); | [A]US6308790 (MENSA-WILMOT GRAHAM [US], et al); | [A]US6640913 (LOCKSTEDT ALAN W [US], et al); | [A]US7059430 (SINGH AMARDEEP [US], et al); | [A]US2007029113 (CHEN SHILIN [US]); | [A]WO2007022185 (BAKER HUGHES INC [US]) | by applicant | US3336992 | US3915246 | EP0178709 | EP0530045 | US5967247 | US6112836 | US6206117 | US2006213691 | US20060462898 | US20060462918 | US20060462929 |