EP2145113 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A TURBOCOMPRESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/03] | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A TURBOCOINPRESSOR | ||
[2011/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atlas Copco Airpower, Naamloze Vennootschap Boomsesteenweg 957 2610 Wilrijk / BE | [2010/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SERBRUYNS, Sven Bert Kerkhofstraat 6 B-9890 Gavere / BE | [2010/03] | Representative(s) | Van Minnebruggen, Ewan Benito Agnes Atlas Copco Airpower, N.V. Airtec Division P.O. Box 101 Boomsesteenweg 957 2610 Wilrijk / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/42] | Donné, Eddy Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv. Arenbergstraat 13 2000 Antwerpen / BE | ||
Former [2010/03] | Donné, Eddy Bureau MFJ Bockstael Arenbergstraat 13 B-2000 Antwerpen / BE | Application number, filing date | 08757049.5 | 07.05.2008 | [2010/03] | WO2008BE00038 | Priority number, date | BE20070000238 | 15.05.2007 Original published format: BE 200700238 | [2010/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008138075 | Date: | 20.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2145113 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2145113 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F04D27/02 | [2010/03] | CPC: |
F04D27/0292 (EP,US);
F04D27/02 (KR);
F04D19/04 (KR);
F04D27/0261 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/42] |
Former [2010/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES TURBOKOMRESSORS | [2010/03] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A TURBOCOMPRESSOR | [2011/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN TURBOCOMPRESSEUR | [2010/03] |
Former [2010/03] | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A TURBOCOINPRESSOR | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2009 | Examination requested [2010/03] | 02.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.10.2018 | EE | 17.10.2018 | HR | 17.10.2018 | LT | 17.10.2018 | LV | 17.10.2018 | MC | 17.10.2018 | MT | 17.10.2018 | RO | 17.10.2018 | SI | 17.10.2018 | SK | 17.10.2018 | BG | 17.01.2019 | IS | 17.02.2019 | PT | 17.02.2019 | LU | 07.05.2019 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/26] | CY | 17.10.2018 | |
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
LU | 07.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | EE | 17.10.2018 | |
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
LU | 07.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | EE | 17.10.2018 | |
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | EE | 17.10.2018 | |
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | EE | 17.10.2018 | |
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | EE | 17.10.2018 | |
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | HR | 17.10.2018 | |
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | HR | 17.10.2018 | |
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | LT | 17.10.2018 | |
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | LT | 17.10.2018 | |
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 17.10.2018 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2929547 (KOFFEL JOHN K) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document * * column 2, line 33 - line 40 *; | [A]US4640665 (STAROSELSKY NAUM [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5224836 (GUNN JOHN T [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US5967742 (MIRSKY SAUL [US], et al) [A] 1* the whole document * |