EP2162150 - VACCINE AGAINST CLOSTRIDIUM PERFRINGENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.2012 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF GUELPH 130 Research Lane Unit 4 Guelph, Ontario N1G 5G3 / CA | [2010/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRESCOTT, John 20 Mont Street Guelph, Ontario N1H 2A4 / CA | 02 /
KULKARNI, Raveendra 221-78 College Avenue West Guelph, Ontario N1G 4S7 / CA | 03 /
PARREIRA, Valeria 467 Edinburgh Road S. Apartment 608 Guelph, Ontario N1G 2Y6 / CA | 04 /
SHARIF, Shayan 136 Ptarmigan Drive Guelph, Ontario N1C 1E9 / CA | [2010/11] | Representative(s) | Thornton, Neil, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/11] | Thornton, Neil, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 08757167.5 | 30.05.2008 | [2010/11] | WO2008CA01031 | Priority number, date | US20070929342P | 22.06.2007 Original published format: US 929342 P | [2010/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009000066 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2162150 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 31.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/08, A23K1/16, A61P31/04, A61P37/04, C07K14/33, C12N15/31, C12N1/21, // A23K1/18 | [2011/41] | CPC: |
A61K39/08 (EP,US);
A23K20/153 (EP,US);
A23K50/70 (EP,US);
A23K50/75 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61K2039/523 (EP,US);
A61K2039/53 (EP,US);
A61K2039/542 (EP,US);
A61K2039/552 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/11] | A61K39/08, A23K1/16, A61P31/04, A61P37/04, C07K14/33, C12N15/31, C12N1/21 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/11] | Title | German: | IMPFSTOFF GEGEN CLOSTRIDIUM PERFRINGENS | [2010/11] | English: | VACCINE AGAINST CLOSTRIDIUM PERFRINGENS | [2010/11] | French: | VACCIN CONTRE LE CLOSTRIDIUM PERFRINGENS | [2010/11] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2009 | Search fee paid | 22.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/11] | 19.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/23] | 19.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [T] - LEE K W ET AL, "Avian necrotic enteritis: Experimental models, host immunity, pathogenesis, risk factors, and vaccine development", POULTRY SCIENCE, CHAMPAIGN, IL, US, (20110701), vol. 90, no. 7, ISSN 0032-5791, pages 1381 - 1390, XP009151736 [T] 1-17 * the whole document * | [A] - MYERS GARRY S A ET AL, "Skewed genomic variability in strains of the toxigenic bacterial pathogen, Clostridium perfringens", GENOME RESEARCH, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, WOODBURY, NY, US, (20060801), vol. 16, no. 8, doi:10.1101/GR.5238106, ISSN 1088-9051, pages 1031 - 1040, XP002496207 [A] 1-17 * see Toxins and Environmental interactions * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/gr.5238106 | [ ] - "RecName: Full=Elongation factor G; Short=EF-G;", UniProt, (20060905), Database accession no. Q0SQE1, URL: EBI [ ] * sequence . * | International search | [X]CA2606180 (SCHERING PLOUGH LTD [CH]); | [X]US7144998 (GIBERT MARYSE [FR], et al); | [X] - SIRARD J.-C. ET AL., "A recombinant Bacillus anthracis strain producing the Clostridium perfringens Ib component induces protection against Iota Toxins", INFECT. IMMUN., (199706), vol. 65, no. 6, pages 2029 - 2033, XP002051133 | [X] - KULKARNI R.R. ET AL., "Clostridium perfringens antigens recognized by broiler chickens immune to necrotic enteritis", CLIN. VACCINE IMMUNOL., (200612), vol. 13, no. 12, pages 1358 - 1362, XP008126343 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/CVI.00292-06 | [XP] - KULKARNI R.R. ET AL., "Immunization of broiler chickens against Clostridium perfringens-induced necrotic enteritis", CLIN. VACCINE IMMUNOL., (200709), vol. 14, no. 9, pages 1070 - 1077, XP008126344 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/CVI.00162-07 | [A] - SHIMIZU T. ET AL., "Complete genome sequence of Clostridium perfringens, an anaerobic flesh-eater", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (20020122), vol. 99, no. 2, pages 996 - 1001, XP002356309 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/PNAS.022493799 |