EP2155445 - DEVICE FOR GUIDING SUPPLY TUBES/FEEDERS ALONG THE STRUCTURE OF AN INDUSTRIAL ROBOT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2011 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.2012 [2012/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PHILIPP, Steffen Bäckergasse 32 D-86150 Augsburg / DE | [2010/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/08] | Application number, filing date | 08757934.8 | 16.04.2008 | [2010/08] | WO2008DE00623 | Priority number, date | DE20071018543 | 17.04.2007 Original published format: DE102007018543 | [2010/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008125093 | Date: | 23.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2155445 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B25J19/00 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
B25J19/0025 (EP);
H02G11/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/08] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM FÜHREN VON VERSORGUNGSLEITUNGEN ENTLANG DER STRUKTUR EINES INDUSTRIEROBOTERS | [2010/08] | English: | DEVICE FOR GUIDING SUPPLY TUBES/FEEDERS ALONG THE STRUCTURE OF AN INDUSTRIAL ROBOT | [2010/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GUIDAGE DE LIGNES D'ALIMENTATION LE LONG DE LA STRUCTURE D'UN ROBOT INDUSTRIEL | [2010/08] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 22.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/01] | 19.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2010 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.10.2010 | 30.04.2011 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2041352 (CHEMAILLE SA) [X] 1-3,8,7 * figure 1 * * page 1, line 16 *; | [X]US4499341 (BOYD JAMES F [US]) [X] 1-3,8 * figure 2 *; | [XD]JPS62213992 (FANUC LTD) [XD] 1-3,8,12 * figure 3 *; | [X]JPS6450711 (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD) [X] 1-3,8,12 * abstract *; | [A]JPH02100892 (FANUC LTD) [A] 5 * abstract *; | [XY]JPH02237793 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [X] 1-3,8,12 * figures 1-3 * [Y] 6,9-11; | [X]US5794487 (SOLOMON TODD R [US], et al) [X] 1-3,12 * figures 8-10 *; | [AD]DE19817605 (KUKA ROBOTER GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE20007000U (KUKA ROBOTER GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1* the whole document *; | [DA]DE20112491U (LEONI PROTEC CABLE SYSTEMS GMB [DE]) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [AD]DE10224858 (KUKA ROBOTER GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE102004019838 (KUKA ROBOTER GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [DY]DE102004028577 (LEONI ELOCAB GMBH [DE]) [DY] 6,9-11 * figure 1 * |