EP2146989 - TRIAZOLOPYRIDINES AS PHOSPHODIESTERASE INHIBITORS FOR TREATMENT OF DERMAL DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2012 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEO PHARMA A/S Industriparken 55 2750 Ballerup / DK | [2010/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FELDING, Jakob Ordrupho̸jvej 29, 1 DK-2920 Charlottenlund / DK | 02 /
SO̸RENSEN, Morten, Dahl Bomlærkevej 15 DK-2970 Ho̸rsholm / DK | [2010/04] | Representative(s) | Thalsoe-Madsen, Kine Birgit, et al Leo Pharma A/S Industriparken 55 2750 Ballerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2010/04] | Thalsoe-Madsen, Kine Birgit, et al Leo Pharma A/S, Industriparken 55 2750 Ballerup / DK | Application number, filing date | 08758202.9 | 16.04.2008 | [2010/04] | WO2008DK00135 | Priority number, date | US20070912020P | 16.04.2007 Original published format: US 912020 P | [2010/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008125111 | Date: | 23.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2146989 | Date: | 27.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2146989 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, A61K31/53, A61P17/00 | [2010/04] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P17/08 (EP);
A61P17/10 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61K31/437 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/04] | Extension states | AL | 16.11.2009 | BA | 16.11.2009 | MK | 16.11.2009 | RS | 16.11.2009 | Title | German: | TRIAZOLOPYRIDINE ALS PHOSPHODIESTERASEHEMMER ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HAUTKRANKHEITEN | [2010/04] | English: | TRIAZOLOPYRIDINES AS PHOSPHODIESTERASE INHIBITORS FOR TREATMENT OF DERMAL DISEASES | [2010/04] | French: | TRIAZOLOPYRIDINES COMME INHIBITEURS DE PHOSPHODIESTÉRASES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES DERMIQUES | [2010/04] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/04] | 19.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.04.2008 | BE | 04.01.2012 | CY | 04.01.2012 | CZ | 04.01.2012 | DK | 04.01.2012 | EE | 04.01.2012 | FI | 04.01.2012 | HR | 04.01.2012 | LT | 04.01.2012 | LV | 04.01.2012 | MT | 04.01.2012 | PL | 04.01.2012 | RO | 04.01.2012 | SI | 04.01.2012 | SK | 04.01.2012 | TR | 04.01.2012 | BG | 04.04.2012 | NO | 04.04.2012 | GR | 05.04.2012 | LU | 16.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | IS | 04.05.2012 | PT | 04.05.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
MT | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
TR | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
LU | 16.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
MT | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
TR | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
MT | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | SI | 04.01.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2004072072 (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al) [A] 1-22,1-22,1-22 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006038116 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US], et al) [A] 1-22,1-22,1-22 * examples 39,41,44,45,50,74,75,87 * * examples 39,41,44,45,50,74,75,87 ** examples 39,41,44,45,50,74,75,87 *; | [A] - BRODBECK B ET AL, "Parallel iterative solution-phase synthesis of 5-amino-1-aryl-[1,2,4]triazolo[1,5-a]pyridine-7-carboxylic acid amide derivatives", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, (20030217), vol. 44, no. 8, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 1675 - 1678, XP004405299 [A] 1-22,1-22,1-22 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(03)00062-5 | by applicant | EP0771794 | EP0943613 | - Z. HUANG; J.A. MANCINI, CURRENT MED. CHEM., (2006), vol. 13, pages 3253 - 3262 | - M.D. HOUSLAY ET AL., DRUG DISCOVERY TODAY, (2005), vol. 10, no. 22, pages 1503 - 1519 | - JOURNAL OF INVESTIGATIVE DERMATOLOGY, (1986), vol. 87, no. 3, pages 372 - 6 | - V. BOSWELL SMITH; D. SPINA, CURR. OPINION INVESTIG. DRUGS, (2006), vol. 6, no. 11, pages 1136 - 1141 | - C. KROEGEL; M. FOERSTER, EXP. OPINION INVESTIG. DRUGS, (2007), vol. 16, no. 1, pages 109 - 124 | - B. LIPWORTH, LANCET, (2005), vol. 365, pages 167 - 175 | - Encyclopedia of Pharmaceutical Technology, (1994), vol. 9 | - Encyclopedia of Pharmaceutical Technology, (1989), vol. 2 | - Modern Pharmaceutics, MARCEL DEKKER, pages 427 - 432 | - Modern Pharmaceutics, MARCEL DEKKER | - Encyclopedia of Pharmaceutical Technology, MARCEL DEKKER, vol. 10, pages 191 - 221 | - TET. LETT., (1995), vol. 36, pages 5319 - 22 | - J. ORG. CHEM., (2000), vol. 65, pages 2847 - 50 | - TET. LETT., (2003), vol. 44, pages 1675 - 78 | - J. ORG. CHEM., (1973), vol. 38, page 1239 |