EP2154976 - METHODS OF CONTROLLING INSECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Syngenta Participations AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/08] | For all designated states Syngenta Participations AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOLLET, Pascal 31, route de la Prairie CH-1260 Nyon / CH | 02 /
PEDRONI, Domingos c/o Syngenta Crop Protection AG Werk Rosental Schwarzwaldallee 215 CH-4058 Basel / CH | 03 /
SKILLMAN, Stephen, Wilson c/o Syngenta Crop Protection AG Werk Rosental Schwarzwaldallee 215 CH-4058 Basel / CH | [2010/08] | Representative(s) | Arunasalam, Velautha-Cumaran Syngenta Crop Protection Münchwilen AG Intellectual Property Schaffhauserstrasse 4332 Stein / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/08] | Arunasalam, Velautha-Cumaran Syngenta Crop Protection Münchwilen AG Intellectual Property Schaffhauserstrasse CH-4332 Stein / CH | Application number, filing date | 08758634.3 | 20.05.2008 | [2010/08] | WO2008EP04023 | Priority number, date | EP20070011725 | 15.06.2007 Original published format: EP 07011725 | [2010/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008151708 | Date: | 18.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2154976 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2154976 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/707 | [2010/50] | CPC: |
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
A01N43/707 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/08] | A01P7/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG VON INSEKTEN | [2010/08] | English: | METHODS OF CONTROLLING INSECTS | [2010/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE LUTTE CONTRE DES INSECTES | [2010/08] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 28.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.07.2011 | HR | 06.07.2011 | IT | 06.07.2011 | MT | 06.07.2011 | NL | 06.07.2011 | TR | 06.07.2011 | GR | 07.10.2011 | ES | 17.10.2011 | IS | 06.11.2011 | PT | 07.11.2011 | [2014/21] |
Former [2013/35] | CY | 06.07.2011 | |
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
IT | 06.07.2011 | ||
MT | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
ES | 17.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 06.07.2011 | |
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
IT | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
ES | 17.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | CY | 06.07.2011 | |
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
IT | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | CY | 06.07.2011 | |
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0314615 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [DA] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2270469 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-12 * claim 1 * * page 6, line 11 - line 17 *; | [A]WO9847368 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-12 * claim 1 * * page 4, line 5 - line 10 *; | [DA]WO0068222 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [DA] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004078843 (KERN MANFRED [DE]) [A] 1-12 * page 2, paragraph 16 * * page 6, paragraph 115 *; | [A]DE102004021566 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE]) [A] 1-12 * page 3, paragraph 7 * * page 14, paragraph 41 ** page 15, paragraph 43 *; | [DA] - B. SECHSER, B. REBER, F. BOURGEOIS, "Pymetrozine: Selectivity spectrum to beneficial arthropods and fitness for integrated pest management", JOURNAL OF PEST SCIENCE, Berlin, (200206), vol. 75, no. 3, pages 72 - 77, XP002458382 [DA] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1034/j.1399-5448.2002.02021.x |