EP2150857 - ILLUMINATION NON-UNIFORMITY QUANTIFICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.10.2012 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.11.2012 [2012/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micronic Mydata AB Box 3141 183 03 Täby / SE | [2010/52] |
Former [2010/06] | For all designated states MICRONIC LASER SYSTEMS AB Nytorpsvägen 9 183 03 Täby / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANDSTRÖM, Torbjörn Banvägen 56 S-435 43 Pixbo / SE | [2010/06] | Application number, filing date | 08759932.0 | 22.05.2008 | [2010/06] | WO2008EP56331 | Priority number, date | US20070939416P | 22.05.2007 Original published format: US 939416 P | [2010/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008142145 | Date: | 27.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2150857 | Date: | 10.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20 | [2010/06] | CPC: |
G03F7/70583 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70483 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70025 (KR);
G03F7/70091 (KR);
G03F7/70558 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/06] | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSUNGLEICHFÖRMIGKEITSQUANTIFIZIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG | [2010/06] | English: | ILLUMINATION NON-UNIFORMITY QUANTIFICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2010/06] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE QUANTIFICATION DE NON-UNIFORMITE D'ECLAIRAGE | [2010/06] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/09] | 07.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/46] | 26.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.04.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0744641 (SVG LITHOGRAPHY SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-6,9,10,22,25,28,29 * abstract * * figures 1,6-8 * * column 1, lines 18-20,24,25 * * column 5, lines 21-23 * * column 6, lines 5-23 *; | [A]JPH0540240 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-29 * abstract *; | [DA] - SHI X, HESSELINK L, "Design of a C aperture to achieve lambda/10 resolution and resonant transmission", JOURNAL OF THE OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA B, (200407), vol. 21, no. 7, pages 1305 - 1317, XP002494425 [DA] 1-29 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/JOSAB.21.001305 |