EP2155167 - CONTROLLED RELEASE PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS FOR PROLONGED EFFECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.01.2019 [2019/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Egalet Ltd. Dechert Llp 160 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4QQ / GB | [2016/40] |
Former [2011/40] | For all designated states Egalet Ltd. Egmont House 8 Clifford Street London W1S 2LQ / GB | ||
Former [2010/08] | For all designated states Egalet A/S Lejrvej 39-41 Kirke Værløse 3500 Værløse / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEMMINGSEN, Pernille Høyrup Tværledet 13 DK-2880 Bagsværd / DK | 02 /
PEDERSEN, Anders Vagnø Geelsdalen 24 DK-2830 Virum / DK | 03 /
BAR-SHALOM, Daniel Rypevænget 213 DK-2980 Kokkedal / DK | [2010/08] | Representative(s) | Johansen, Marianne, et al Chas. Hude A/S H.C. Andersens Boulevard 33 1780 Copenhagen V / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | ||
Former [2010/08] | Johansen, Marianne, et al Zacco Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | Application number, filing date | 08760491.4 | 04.06.2008 | [2010/08] | WO2008EP56910 | Priority number, date | DK20070000816 | 04.06.2007 Original published format: DK 200700816 | US20070941848P | 04.06.2007 Original published format: US 941848 P | [2010/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008148798 | Date: | 11.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2155167 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/20, A61K9/28 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
A61K9/2086 (EP,US);
A61K31/167 (EP,US);
A61K31/485 (EP,US);
A61K31/573 (EP,US);
A61K9/2072 (EP,US);
A61K9/209 (EP,US);
A61K9/2853 (US);
A61K9/2866 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/08] | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT GESTEUERTER FREISETZUNG FÜR VERLÄNGERTE WIRKUNG | [2010/08] | English: | CONTROLLED RELEASE PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS FOR PROLONGED EFFECT | [2010/08] | French: | COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES À LIBÉRATION CONTRÔLÉE POUR UN EFFET PROLONGÉ | [2010/08] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 03.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/02] | 31.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.11.2015 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 05.09.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 05.09.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.09.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2018 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | Date: | 02.09.2016 | [2016/42] | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4898733 (DEPRINCE RANDOLPH B [US], et al) [Y] 1-28 * figure 2 ** claim - *; | [X]WO9104015 (BUKH MEDITEC [DK]) [X] 1-28 * figures 1-6 * * claim - * * example - *; | [Y]WO03075897 (JAGOTEC AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-28 * figure 3 * * examples 5,6 * * claim - *; | [X]WO2006128471 (EGALET AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-28 * figure 1 * * example 1 * * claim - * |