EP2157978 - MC-1 R, MC-2 R, AND MU OPIOID RECEPTORS MODULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2013 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.04.2013 [2013/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Beauty Care Solutions France SAS 32, rue Saint-Jean-de-Dieu 69007 Lyon / FR | [2010/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAIN, Sabine Montée du gravier Rouge 38200 Vienne / FR | 02 /
DEZUTTER, Colette 6 chemin des Sylphides F-38200 Vienne / FR | 03 /
ANDRE, Valérie 15 rue de Montlys F-69420 Ampuis / FR | 04 /
REYMERMIER, Corinne 48 chemin du Béard F-69390 Charly / FR | 05 /
ORLY, Isabelle 8 rue Delbourg F-69540 Irigny / FR | 06 /
PERRIER, Eric Chemin des Lauriers F-38138 Les Cotes D'arey / FR | [2010/24] |
Former [2010/09] | 01 /
PAIN, Sabine 37 boulevard Jean XXIII F-69008 Lyon / FR | ||
02 /
DEZUTTER, Colette 6 chemin des Sylphides F-38200 Vienne / FR | |||
03 /
ANDRE, Valérie 15 rue de Montlys F-69420 Ampuis / FR | |||
04 /
REYMERMIER, Corinne 48 chemin du Béard F-69390 Charly / FR | |||
05 /
ORLY, Isabelle 8 rue Delbourg F-69540 Irigny / FR | |||
06 /
PERRIER, Eric Chemin des Lauriers F-38138 Les Cotes D'arey / FR | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/34] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | ||
Former [2010/09] | Dorff, Gernot Peter Roderich, et al Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 08760699.2 | 06.06.2008 | [2010/09] | WO2008EP57130 | Priority number, date | FR20070055529 | 06.06.2007 Original published format: FR 0755529 | [2010/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008148892 | Date: | 11.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2157978 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K36/14, A61K8/97, A61Q19/08, A61P17/00, A61K31/437 | [2010/09] | CPC: |
A61K36/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/9783 (KR);
A61K31/19 (KR);
A61K31/216 (EP,US);
A61K31/343 (EP,US);
A61K31/437 (EP,KR,US);
A61K36/185 (EP,US);
A61K36/24 (EP,US);
A61K36/28 (EP,US);
A61K36/48 (EP,KR,US);
A61K36/53 (EP,US);
A61K36/736 (EP,US);
A61K36/752 (EP,US);
A61K36/888 (EP,US);
A61K36/90 (EP,US);
A61K8/9761 (EP,US);
A61K8/9789 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/9794 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP,KR);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/16 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/09] | Title | German: | MC-1R-, MC-2R- UND/ODER MU OPIOID-REZEPTOR-MODULATION | [2010/09] | English: | MC-1 R, MC-2 R, AND MU OPIOID RECEPTORS MODULATION | [2010/09] | French: | MODULATION DE MC-1R, MC-2R ET DES RÉCEPTEURS MU OPIOÏDES | [2010/09] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/09] | 26.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2010 | Observations by third parties | 10.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/16] | 27.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/16] | Divisional application(s) | EP12189355.6 / EP2574332 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.04.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2003228658 (SHU YOUMIN [US], et al) [X] 1-5,10,13-15 * paragraphs [0019] , [0126] , [0127] , [0130] , [0131] *; | [X]US2003110518 (HOUSEKNECHT KAREN L [US], et al) [X] 1-5,10,13-15 * paragraphs [0186] , [0226] , [0229] , [0233] *; | [X]WO9747316 (MILLENNIUM PHARM INC [US]) [X] 1-5,10,13-15 * page 40 - page 42 *; | [X] - BORDE NATHALIE ET AL, "Effects of methyl beta-carboline-3-carboxylate on memory impairments induced by chronic alcohol consumption in mice", PROGRESS IN NEURO-PSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY AND BIOLOGICAL PSYCHIATRY, (1996), vol. 20, no. 8, ISSN 0278-5846, pages 1377 - 1387, XP002495557 [X] 1,2,4,6,11,13,14 * page 1379 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0278-5846(96)00133-9 | [X] - OAKLEY N R ET AL, "DIFFERENTIAL PHARMACOLOGICAL EFFECTS OF BETA CARBOLINE-3-CARBOXYLIC-ACID ESTERS", NEUROPHARMACOLOGY, (1982), vol. 21, no. 6, ISSN 0028-3908, pages 587 - 590, XP002495558 [X] 1,2,4,6,11,13,14 * page 587 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0028-3908(82)90052-1 | [A] - TSATMALI MARINA ET AL, "Skin POMC peptides: Their actions at the human MC-1 receptor and roles in the tanning response", PIGMENT CELL RESEARCH, (2000), vol. 13, no. Supplement 8, ISSN 0893-5785, pages 125 - 129, XP009095072 [A] 1-8,10,11,13-15 * the whole document * | [A] - HIROBE TOMOHISA ET AL, "The melanocortin receptor-1 gene but not the proopiomelanocortin gene is expressed in melanoblasts and contributes their differentiation in the mouse skin", PIGMENT CELL RESEARCH, (200412), vol. 17, no. 6, ISSN 0893-5785, pages 627 - 635, XP002466465 [A] 1-8,10,11,13-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1600-0749.2004.00179.x | other | - "Nuskha-e-Zimaad", TKDL, Database accession no. AA20/21A, XP003027373 | - ABU BAKR MOHAMMAD BIN ZAKARIYYA AL-RAZI, Kitaab-al-haawi-fil-Tibb, (1967), vol. XX, page 21 | - "Dalook-e-Abhal", TKDL, Database accession no. MH3/62F, XP003027374 | - MOHAMMAD AZAM KHAN, Muheet-e-Azam, (1896), vol. I, page 123 | - "Natool", TKDL, Database accession no. AA20/230A27A, XP003027375 | - ABU BAKR MOHAMMAD BIN ZAKARIYYA AL-RAZI, Kitaab-al-Haawi-fil-Tibb, (1967), page 207 | - "Tila-e-harmal", TKDL, Database accession no. Ma2/193, XP003027376 | - AMINUDDAULAH ABUL FARJ IBN AL-QUFF MASEEHI, Kitaab-al-'Umdah-fil-Jeraahat, (1937), vol. II, page 51 | - "Zimaad-e-samagh-e-aaloo Baloo", TKDL, Database accession no. MH3/40D1, XP003027377 | - MOHAMMAD AZAM KHAN, Muheet-e-Azam, (1896), vol. I, page 110 | - "Zimaad-e-kharbaq Siyah Barae Kalf Va Namash", TKDL, Database accession no. AN2/482G, XP003027378 | - MOHAMMAD NAJMUL GHANI KHAN, Khazaain-al-Advia, (1911), vol. II, page 494 | - "Ubtan Muhsin-e-laun", TKDL, Database accession no. NA4/139, XP003027379 | - MOHAMMAD NAJMUL GHANI KHAN, Qaraabaadeen Najm-al-Ghani, (1928), vol. 2ND, page 34 |