EP2183675 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR DETECTING CABLE LENGTH IN A STORAGE SUBSYSTEM WITH WIDE PORTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2013 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [2012/34] |
Former [2010/19] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAGNO, Brian, James c/o IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Law Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | 02 /
LUCAS, Gregg, Steven 675 North Circle D Way Tucson, Arizona 85748 / US | 03 /
TRUMAN, Thomas, Stanley 2425 North Placita Del Clavel Tucson, Arizona 85749 / US | [2012/34] |
Former [2010/21] | 01 /
CAGNO, Brian, James c/o IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Law Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
02 /
LUCAS, Gregg, Steven 675 North Circle D Way Tucson, Arizona 85748 / US | |||
03 /
TRUMAN, Thomas, Stanley 2425 North Placita Del Clavel Tucson, Arizona 85749 / US | |||
Former [2010/19] | 01 /
CAGNO, Brian, James 8861 East Windflower Drive Tucson, Arizona 85715 / US | ||
02 /
LUCAS, Gregg, Steven 675 North Circle D Way Tucson, Arizona 85748 / US | |||
03 /
TRUMAN, Thomas, Stanley 2425 North Placita Del Clavel Tucson, Arizona 85749 / US | Representative(s) | Stretton, Peter John IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Law Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [2012/34] |
Former [2010/19] | Stretton, Peter John IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Law Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 08761166.1 | 18.06.2008 | [2010/19] | WO2008EP57713 | Priority number, date | US20070828667 | 26.07.2007 Original published format: US 828667 | [2010/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009013081 | Date: | 29.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2183675 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2183675 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/40 | [2010/19] | CPC: |
G06F13/4068 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/19] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM DETEKTIEREN EINER KABELLÄNGE IN EINEM SPEICHERUNGSSUBSYSTEM MIT BREITEN PORTS | [2010/19] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR DETECTING CABLE LENGTH IN A STORAGE SUBSYSTEM WITH WIDE PORTS | [2010/19] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR DÉTECTER LA LONGUEUR DE CÂBLES DANS UN SOUS-SYSTÈME DE STOCKAGE AYANT DES PORTS LARGES | [2010/19] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/19] | 24.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 23.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.06.2008 | AT | 22.08.2012 | BE | 22.08.2012 | CY | 22.08.2012 | CZ | 22.08.2012 | DK | 22.08.2012 | EE | 22.08.2012 | FI | 22.08.2012 | HR | 22.08.2012 | IT | 22.08.2012 | LT | 22.08.2012 | LV | 22.08.2012 | MC | 22.08.2012 | MT | 22.08.2012 | NL | 22.08.2012 | PL | 22.08.2012 | RO | 22.08.2012 | SE | 22.08.2012 | SI | 22.08.2012 | SK | 22.08.2012 | TR | 22.08.2012 | BG | 22.11.2012 | NO | 22.11.2012 | GR | 23.11.2012 | ES | 03.12.2012 | IS | 22.12.2012 | PT | 24.12.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
MC | 22.08.2012 | ||
MT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
TR | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
MC | 22.08.2012 | ||
MT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
MC | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 22.08.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5838726 (NEMOTO KENJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 2-4,9,10 * * column 2, line 10 - line 36 * * column 4, line 6 - line 29 * * column 5, line 1 - line 6 *; | [A]JPH09166406 (SONY CORP) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]US5818378 (CHENG YI [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005066203 (HANDA TAKUYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5838726 |