EP2152541 - LIFTING DEVICE FOR A VEHICLE AND A VEHICLE EQUIPPED WITH THE LIFTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seppälä, Teijo Laajavuorentie 7 C 35 40740 Jyväskylä / FI | [2010/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/07] | Representative(s) | Helke, Kimmo Kalervo Kespat Oy P.O. Box 601 40101 Jyväskylä / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2012/05] | Helke, Kimmo Kalervo Kespat Oy P.O. Box 601 40101 Jyväskylä / FI | ||
Former [2010/07] | Helke, Kimmo Kalervo Kespat Oy P.O. Box 601 40101 Jyväskylä / FI | Application number, filing date | 08761657.9 | 12.05.2008 | [2010/07] | WO2008FI50261 | Priority number, date | FI20070005333 | 10.05.2007 Original published format: FI 20075333 | [2010/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008139035 | Date: | 20.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2152541 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2152541 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 20.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60P1/54, B66C23/44 | [2010/07] | CPC: |
B60P1/549 (EP);
B60P1/5404 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/07] | Title | German: | HEBEVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG UND MIT EINER DERARTIGEN HEBEVORRICHTUNG AUSGESTATTETES FAHRZEUG | [2010/07] | English: | LIFTING DEVICE FOR A VEHICLE AND A VEHICLE EQUIPPED WITH THE LIFTING DEVICE | [2010/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE LEVAGE POUR VEHICULE ET VEHICULE EQUIPE DUDIT DISPOSITIF | [2010/07] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2009 | Search fee paid | 30.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/07] | 31.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 05.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.05.2008 | BE | 01.02.2012 | CY | 01.02.2012 | DK | 01.02.2012 | EE | 01.02.2012 | HR | 01.02.2012 | LT | 01.02.2012 | LV | 01.02.2012 | MT | 01.02.2012 | PL | 01.02.2012 | RO | 01.02.2012 | SI | 01.02.2012 | SK | 01.02.2012 | BG | 01.05.2012 | NO | 01.05.2012 | GR | 02.05.2012 | IE | 12.05.2012 | LU | 12.05.2012 | CH | 31.05.2012 | LI | 31.05.2012 | MC | 31.05.2012 | IS | 01.06.2012 | PT | 01.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
MT | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
BG | 01.05.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IE | 12.05.2012 | ||
LU | 12.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
MT | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
BG | 01.05.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IE | 12.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
BG | 01.05.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IE | 12.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IE | 12.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/03] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 01.02.2012 | |
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 01.02.2012 | |
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1178365 (BELTRAMI S P A [IT]) [A] 1 * figures 1-2; claim 1 *; | [A]WO8906612 (INTERWOOD OY [FI]) [A] 1-15 * page 2 - page 4, paragraph 1; figure 1 *; | [A]GB2353267 (BRIGGS OWEN PETER [GB]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]KR20060006670 (DAEHO CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1* figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO2006009356 (DAEHO CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 8 - page 10, line 15; figure 1 * | International search | [A]GB1178365 (BELTRAMI S P A [IT]); | [A]DE2205583 (KRONE BERNHARD GMBH MASCHF); | [A]GB2353518 (SIMMONDS DAVID [GB]) |