EP2158749 - EFFICIENTLY MANAGING UNAUTHORIZED REGISTRATION REQUESTS AT A FEMTOCELL BASESTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.08.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2014 | Refusal of application | published on 10.09.2014 [2014/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ubiquisys Limited The Stella Building Windmill Hill Business Park Whitehall Way Swindon SN5 6NX / GB | [2010/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHNSTONE, Justin UbiquiSys Limited The Stella Building Windmill Hill Businness Park Whitehill Way Swindon SN5 6NX / GB | 02 /
GUISTINA, Andrea Corso Plebisciti 19-20129 Milan / IT | 03 /
KEEVILL, Peter 7 Junction Road Bath BA2 3NQ / GB | 04 /
BYRNE, Richard Midway, The Ridge Cold. Ash, Thatcham Berkshire RG18 9HX / GB | [2010/09] | Representative(s) | O'Connell, David Christopher Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/09] | O'Connell, David Christopher Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 08762303.9 | 06.06.2008 | [2010/09] | WO2008GB01962 | Priority number, date | GB20070010875 | 06.06.2007 Original published format: GB 0710875 | [2010/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008149116 | Date: | 11.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2158749 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/12 | [2010/09] | CPC: |
H04W48/02 (EP,GB,US);
H04W60/00 (EP,US);
H04W84/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/09] | Title | German: | EFFIZIENTES VERWALTEN VON UNBEFUGTEN REGISTRATIONSANFORDERUNGEN IN EINER FEMTOZELLEN -BASISSTATION | [2010/09] | English: | EFFICIENTLY MANAGING UNAUTHORIZED REGISTRATION REQUESTS AT A FEMTOCELL BASESTATION | [2010/09] | French: | STATION DE BASE CELLULAIRE | [2010/09] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/09] | 18.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.04.2014 | 03.04.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 24.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/37] | 04.05.2014 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.03.2010 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.03.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 15.03.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.03.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2315193 (ORANGE PERSONAL COMM SERV LTD [GB]); | [X]WO9837721 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al); | [X]EP1492374 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]); | Examination | WO2007015068 | US2007183427 |