EP2160596 - ELECTROCHEMICAL DATA REJECTION METHODOLOGY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.04.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.05.2017 [2017/20] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | For:DE
Roche Diabetes Care GmbH Sandhofer Straße 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/35] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | ||
For:DE
Roche Diabetes Care GmbH Sandhofer Straße 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | |||
Former [2010/10] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F.HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | ||
For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LORIMER, Kevin Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhoferstrasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
CARTER, Nigel, Fawbert Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhoferstrasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | 03 /
ALLAN, Andrew, William Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhoferstrasse 116 68305 Mannhein / DE | 04 /
ORMAN, Howard, James Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhoferstrasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [2010/10] | Representative(s) | Simons, Amanda Louise, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/10] | Simons, Amanda Louise, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08762398.9 | 18.06.2008 | [2010/10] | WO2008GB02074 | Priority number, date | GB20070011780 | 18.06.2007 Original published format: GB 0711780 | [2010/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008155539 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2160596 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/49, A61B5/00, C12Q1/00 | [2010/10] | CPC: |
A61B5/14546 (EP,US);
G01N27/3271 (EP,US);
A61B5/150022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/10] | Title | German: | METHODIK ZUR ZURÜCKWEISUNG ELEKTOCHEMISCHER DATEN | [2010/10] | English: | ELECTROCHEMICAL DATA REJECTION METHODOLOGY | [2010/10] | French: | MÉTHODOLOGIE DE REJET DE DONNÉES ÉLECTROCHIMIQUES | [2010/10] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/10] | 14.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/20] | 11.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.01.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2007013915 (BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * paragraph [0156] - paragraph [0167]; figures 6D,9A,9B *; | [A]US5352351 (WHITE BRADLEY E [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * column 6, line 56 - column 7, line 57 *; | [A]EP1783486 (LIFESCAN INC [US]) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036] *; | [A]US2002053523 (LIAMOS CHARLES T [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0189] *; | [A]EP1541998 (ARKRAY INC [JP]) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0055]; figures 5A,5B,5C * | Examination | WO2006109280 | by applicant | WO2006030170 | WO2007072013 | WO2006000828 | - A. J BARD; L. R. FAULKNER, Electrochemical Methods: Furadamentals and Applications, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (2001), page 175 | - JOURNAL OF ELECTROANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (1987), vol. 217, pages 417 - 423 |