EP2162036 - DEVICE TO PREVENT THE LEAKAGE OF FROTH FROM A COOKING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.10.2013 [2013/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deppieri, Erminio Via Selvanese, 13 30030 Olmo di Martellago / IT | [2010/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/11] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/11] | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2 33100 Udine / IT | Application number, filing date | 08762745.1 | 30.05.2008 | [2010/11] | WO2008IB01385 | Priority number, date | IT2007UD00098 | 31.05.2007 Original published format: IT UD20070098 | [2010/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008146148 | Date: | 04.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2162036 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A47J27/56, A01J11/02, B01B1/02 | [2010/11] | CPC: |
A47J27/56 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/11] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERHINDERUNG DES AUSLAUFENS VON SCHAUM AUS EINEM KOCHGERÄT | [2012/51] | English: | DEVICE TO PREVENT THE LEAKAGE OF FROTH FROM A COOKING APPARATUS | [2010/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR EMPÊCHER LA FUITE DE MOUSSE À PARTIR D'UN APPAREIL DE CUISSON | [2010/11] |
Former [2010/11] | VERFAHREN ZUR VERHINDERUNG DES AUSLAUFENS VON SCHAUM AUS EINEM KOCHGERÄT | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/11] | 12.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/43] | 29.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.08.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US5181836 (ZEITLIN ERIC S [US]) [X] 1,6 * column 4, line 15 - column 11, line 16; figures 1-6 * [A] 2-5,7-21; | [A]US6638028 (POULIN JR RICHARD A [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 18; figures 1-4 * |