EP2207447 - ITEM OF CLOTHING FOR THE FOOT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 11.02.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2022 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bachinger, Philipp Johannes Aggsbach Markt 159 3641 Aggsbach Markt / AT | [2016/19] |
Former [2010/29] | For all designated states Hesch, Rolf Dieter, Prof. Dr. Med. Mövenweg 87-89 8597 Landschlacht / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/29] | Representative(s) | Heisel, Wolfgang, et al Heisel Patente Marken Designs Hauptstrasse 14 8280 Kreuzlingen / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/42] | Heisel, Wolfgang, et al HEISEL Patente Marken Designs Hauptstrasse 14 8280 Kreuzlingen / CH | Application number, filing date | 08762997.8 | 04.07.2008 | [2010/29] | WO2008IB01767 | Priority number, date | DE20072009533U | 06.07.2007 Original published format: DE 202007009533 U | DE20072011165U | 09.08.2007 Original published format: DE 202007011165 U | DE20071059975 | 11.12.2007 Original published format: DE102007059975 | [2010/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009007821 | Date: | 15.01.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2207447 | Date: | 21.07.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2207447 | Date: | 13.01.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A43B5/06, A43B7/26, A43B13/22, A43B5/08, A41B11/00 | [2015/28] | CPC: |
A43B5/06 (EP);
A43B13/22 (EP);
A43B5/08 (EP);
A43B7/26 (EP);
A41B11/003 (EP);
A41B11/004 (EP);
A41D2400/44 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/29] | A43B5/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/02] |
Former [2010/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FUSSBEKLEIDUNGSSTÜCK | [2010/29] | English: | ITEM OF CLOTHING FOR THE FOOT | [2010/29] | French: | ARTICLE D'HABILLEMENT POUR LES PIEDS | [2010/29] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 17.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/29] | 20.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 20.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.10.2016
18.10.2016
ADMISSIBLE Vibram S.p.A. Via C. Colombo, 5 21041 Albizzate (Varese) / IT Opponent's representative Feltrinelli, Secondo Andrea APTA S.r.l. Patent Department Via Ca' di Cozzi, 41 37124 Verona / IT | [2016/47] | 16.11.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.05.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.10.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.04.2019 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.04.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 24.03.2021 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 02.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 25.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 04.11.2021 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2022/11] | Appeal following opposition | 18.06.2019 | Appeal received No. T1776/19 | 12.08.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 24.03.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Request for further processing for: | 12.05.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 12.05.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.06.2010 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 12.05.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 12.05.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.06.2010 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 12.05.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 12.05.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.06.2010 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 12.05.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 12.05.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.06.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.01.2011 | 31.07.2012 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.07.2008 | CY | 13.01.2016 | CZ | 13.01.2016 | DK | 13.01.2016 | EE | 13.01.2016 | ES | 13.01.2016 | FI | 13.01.2016 | HR | 13.01.2016 | IT | 13.01.2016 | LT | 13.01.2016 | LV | 13.01.2016 | MC | 13.01.2016 | MT | 13.01.2016 | NL | 13.01.2016 | PL | 13.01.2016 | RO | 13.01.2016 | SE | 13.01.2016 | SI | 13.01.2016 | SK | 13.01.2016 | TR | 13.01.2016 | BG | 13.04.2016 | NO | 13.04.2016 | GR | 14.04.2016 | IS | 13.05.2016 | PT | 13.05.2016 | AT | 04.07.2016 | IE | 04.07.2016 | LU | 04.07.2016 | BE | 31.07.2016 | CH | 31.07.2016 | LI | 31.07.2016 | GB | 04.07.2020 | FR | 31.07.2020 | DE | 02.02.2021 | [2021/25] |
Former [2021/23] | HU | 04.07.2008 | |
CY | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
MT | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
TR | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
AT | 04.07.2016 | ||
IE | 04.07.2016 | ||
LU | 04.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
GB | 04.07.2020 | ||
FR | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | HU | 04.07.2008 | |
CY | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
MT | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
TR | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
AT | 04.07.2016 | ||
IE | 04.07.2016 | ||
LU | 04.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
GB | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2018/33] | HU | 04.07.2008 | |
CY | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
MT | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
TR | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
AT | 04.07.2016 | ||
IE | 04.07.2016 | ||
LU | 04.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 04.07.2008 | |
CY | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
TR | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
AT | 04.07.2016 | ||
IE | 04.07.2016 | ||
LU | 04.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 04.07.2008 | |
CY | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
AT | 04.07.2016 | ||
IE | 04.07.2016 | ||
LU | 04.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 13.01.2016 | |
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
AT | 04.07.2016 | ||
IE | 04.07.2016 | ||
LU | 04.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | CZ | 13.01.2016 | |
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
IE | 04.07.2016 | ||
LU | 04.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/20] | CZ | 13.01.2016 | |
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | CZ | 13.01.2016 | |
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 13.01.2016 | |
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 13.01.2016 | |
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | DK | 13.01.2016 | |
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | DK | 13.01.2016 | |
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | ES | 13.01.2016 | |
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | ES | 13.01.2016 | |
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | ES | 13.01.2016 | |
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 13.01.2016 | |
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 13.01.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2005166427 (GREENE PAMELA S [US] ET AL) [X] 1-6,9,10 * page 2, paragraphs 32,33 * * page 3, paragraph 35; figures 3,15 * * page 3, paragraphs 37-39; figures 1-3 * * claims 1,10 * [Y] 7,8; | [Y]US2003074718 (ENGLISH VICTORIA W [US]) [Y] 7,8 * paragraphs [0044] - [0046]; figure 4 *; | [A]WO9817138 (ONEILL INC [US]) [A] 1,9 * abstract *; | [A]DE20108773U (ENSENMEIER DAGMAR [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE102005048710 (KERN-BASELITZ ELKE [DE]) [A] 9 * paragraph [0015] *; | [A]US4294022 (STOCKLI ANDRE ET AL) [A] 7 * figure - * | Opposition | DE202006001381U | GB580024 | JP2006348406 | US6286151 | US6805681 | US2001041855 | WO2007010343 | US2006130217 | US5445598 | JP2003190198 | WO2007038487 | US5774898 | US4651354 | US2005166427 | US2003074718 | WO9817138 | DE20108773U | DE102005048710 | US4294022 | GB279404 |