EP2180786 - SHELF STABLE, REDUCED CORROSION, READY TO USE PEROXYCARBOXYLIC ACID ANTIMICROBIAL COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ecolab INC. 370 North Wabasha Street St. Paul, MN 55102 / US | [2017/04] |
Former [2010/18] | For all designated states Ecolab INC. 370 North Wabasha Street St. Paul, MN 55102 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEDERSEN, Daniel E. 8798 Indian Blvd. S. Cottage Grove, Minnesota 55016 / US | 02 /
MOLINARO, Katherine J. 653 Brockton Curve Eagan, MN 55123 / US | 03 /
BESSE, Michael 7450 Winnetka Heights Drive Golden Valley, Minnesota 55427 / US | [2010/31] |
Former [2010/18] | 01 /
PEDERSEN, Daniel E. 8798 Indian Blvd. S. Cottage Grove, Minnesota 55016 / US | ||
02 /
MOLINARO, Katherine J. 4612 Blaine Avenue Inver Grove Heights, Minnesota 55076 / US | |||
03 /
BESSE, Michael 7450 Winnetka Heights Drive Golden Valley, Minnesota 55427 / US | Representative(s) | Godemeyer Blum Lenze Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB - werkpatent An den Gärten 7 51491 Overath / DE | [2017/04] |
Former [2013/52] | Godemeyer Blum Lenze - werkpatent An den Gärten 7 51491 Overath / DE | ||
Former [2012/02] | Polypatent An den Gärten 7 51491 Overath / DE | ||
Former [2010/18] | Polypatent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 08763259.2 | 09.06.2008 | [2010/18] | WO2008IB52265 | Priority number, date | US20070847604 | 30.08.2007 Original published format: US 847604 | [2010/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009027857 | Date: | 05.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2180786 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2180786 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.03.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A01N37/02, A01N59/00, A01N37/10, A01N25/22, A01N37/38, A61L2/18, A01N37/16 | [2015/11] | CPC: |
A01N37/16 (EP,US);
A01N37/00 (US);
A01N59/00 (US);
A61L2/186 (EP,US);
A61L2202/24 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N37/16, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N37/16, A01N25/22, A01N37/02, A01N37/10, A01N37/38, A01N59/00 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2010/18] | A01N37/00, A01N33/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/04] |
Former [2010/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | LAGERSTABILE KORROSIONSARME GEBRAUCHSFERTIGE ANTIMIKROBIELLE PEROXYCARBONSÄUREZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2010/18] | English: | SHELF STABLE, REDUCED CORROSION, READY TO USE PEROXYCARBOXYLIC ACID ANTIMICROBIAL COMPOSITIONS | [2010/18] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ANTIMICROBIENNES À BASE D'ACIDE PEROXYCARBOXYLIQUE PRÊTES À L'EMPLOI À CORROSION RÉDUITE ET DE LONGUE CONSERVATION | [2010/18] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2010 | Search fee paid | 07.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/18] | 02.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17150764.3 / EP3175710 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.06.2008 | AT | 25.01.2017 | CY | 25.01.2017 | CZ | 25.01.2017 | DK | 25.01.2017 | EE | 25.01.2017 | FI | 25.01.2017 | HR | 25.01.2017 | LT | 25.01.2017 | LV | 25.01.2017 | MC | 25.01.2017 | NL | 25.01.2017 | PL | 25.01.2017 | RO | 25.01.2017 | SE | 25.01.2017 | SI | 25.01.2017 | SK | 25.01.2017 | TR | 25.01.2017 | BG | 25.04.2017 | NO | 25.04.2017 | GR | 26.04.2017 | IS | 25.05.2017 | PT | 25.05.2017 | IE | 09.06.2017 | LU | 09.06.2017 | MT | 09.06.2017 | BE | 30.06.2017 | CH | 30.06.2017 | LI | 30.06.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 09.06.2008 | |
AT | 25.01.2017 | ||
CY | 25.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
IE | 09.06.2017 | ||
LU | 09.06.2017 | ||
MT | 09.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 09.06.2008 | |
AT | 25.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
IE | 09.06.2017 | ||
LU | 09.06.2017 | ||
MT | 09.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
IE | 09.06.2017 | ||
LU | 09.06.2017 | ||
MT | 09.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
IE | 09.06.2017 | ||
LU | 09.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
IE | 09.06.2017 | ||
LU | 09.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
LU | 09.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4743447 (LE ROUZIC DANIEL [FR], et al) [Y] 1-14 * column 5, lines 20-39; example 2 *; | [Y]US5437868 (OAKES THOMAS R [US], et al) [Y] 3 * column 2, lines 27-38 * * columns 16-19; examples 17-22; tables XIV, XV *; | [Y]US5900256 (SCOVILLE JR JOHN R [US], et al) [Y] 7-9,12 * column 4, lines 41-45; claim 1 *; | [XY]US6444230 (HAMON GODIN CATHERINE [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,10,14 * column 6, line 62 - column 7, line 7 * [Y] 1-14; | [XY]EP1252819 (SEPPIC SA [FR]) [X] 1,2,4-6,10,11,13,14 * paragraphs [0007] , [0 26] , [0 36] - [0042] * [Y] 1-14; | [A]US2007158612 (MAES JEAN-PIERRE L [BE], et al) [A] 3,7,9-12* Examples and; paragraph [0010] * | International search | [A]US5718910 (OAKES THOMAS R [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * see whole document *; | [A]US6514556 (HILGREN JOHN D [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * see whole document *; | [A]US6627657 (HILGREN JOHN D [US], et al) [A] 1-23* see whole document *; | [A]US6927237 (HEI ROBERT D P [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * see whole document * | by applicant | US4647392 | US4743447 | US5200189 | US5314687 | US5409713 | US5437868 | US5489434 | US5900256 | US6010729 | US6111963 | US6444230 | EP1252819 | US6514556 | US6674538 | US2007158612 |