EP2291752 - DATA STORAGE DEVICE WITH MULTIPLE PROTOCOLS FOR PRELOADING DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SanDisk IL Ltd 7 Atir Yeda St. Kfar Saba / IL | [2013/45] |
Former [2011/10] | For all designated states SanDisk IL Ltd. 7 Atir Yeda Street 44425 Kfar Saba / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARDIKS, Eitan 18 Moshe Dayan St. 43580 Ra'anana / IL | [2011/10] | Representative(s) | Hitchcock, Esmond Antony Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/10] | Hitchcock, Esmond Antony Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08763629.6 | 26.06.2008 | [2011/10] | WO2008IL00872 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009156977 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2291752 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/40 | [2011/10] | CPC: |
G06F13/4068 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/10] | Title | German: | DATENSPEICHEREINRICHTUNG MIT MEHREREN PROTOKOLLEN ZUM VORLADEN VON DATEN | [2011/10] | English: | DATA STORAGE DEVICE WITH MULTIPLE PROTOCOLS FOR PRELOADING DATA | [2011/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE DE DONNÉES À MULTIPLES PROTOCOLES POUR PRÉCHARGER DES DONNÉES | [2011/10] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/10] | 14.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/23] | 17.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.01.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5594874 (NARAYANAN PUDUCODE S [US] ET AL) [X] 1-31 * column 5, line 22 - line 27 * * column 15, line 19 - line 28 * * figure 4 * |