EP2176021 - CUTTING TOOL AND CUTTING INSERT THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Iscar Ltd. P.O. Box 11 24959 Tefen / IL | [2010/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HECHT, Gil 30/18 Ahad Ha'am Street 22443 Nahariya / IL | [2010/16] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/16] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08763692.4 | 09.07.2008 | [2010/16] | WO2008IL00938 | Priority number, date | IL20070185048 | 05.08.2007 Original published format: IL 18504807 | [2010/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009019676 | Date: | 12.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2176021 | Date: | 21.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2176021 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B23B27/04, B23B27/08, B23B27/16, B23B29/04 | [2010/16] | CPC: |
B23B27/045 (EP,US);
B23B27/083 (EP,US);
B23B27/1614 (EP,US);
B23B29/043 (EP,US);
B23B2200/121 (EP,US);
B23B2200/161 (EP,US);
B23B2200/165 (EP,US);
B23B2200/369 (EP,US);
Y10T407/1932 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/16] | Title | German: | SCHNEIDWERKZEUG UND SCHNEIDEINSATZ DAFÜR | [2010/16] | English: | CUTTING TOOL AND CUTTING INSERT THEREFOR | [2010/16] | French: | OUTIL DE COUPE ET INSERT DE COUPE POUR CELUI-CI | [2010/16] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/16] | 07.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 22.12.2010 | CY | 22.12.2010 | DK | 22.12.2010 | EE | 22.12.2010 | FI | 22.12.2010 | HR | 22.12.2010 | HU | 22.12.2010 | LT | 22.12.2010 | LV | 22.12.2010 | MT | 22.12.2010 | NL | 22.12.2010 | RO | 22.12.2010 | SI | 22.12.2010 | SK | 22.12.2010 | BG | 22.03.2011 | NO | 22.03.2011 | GR | 23.03.2011 | IS | 22.04.2011 | IE | 09.07.2011 | LU | 09.07.2011 | MC | 31.07.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/25] | BE | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
MT | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
NO | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
IE | 09.07.2011 | ||
LU | 09.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
MT | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
NO | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
IE | 09.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | BE | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
MT | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
NO | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | BE | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
MT | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
NO | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | BE | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
NO | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | BE | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
NO | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | BE | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
NO | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | BE | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
NO | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | BE | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
NO | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | BE | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
NO | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3629919 (TREVARROW DAVID J JR) [X] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [X]US4315706 (ERKFRITZ DONALD S) [X] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [AD]US5947648 (FRIEDMAN YACOB [IL], et al); | [X]EP1647346 (SECO TOOLS AB [SE]) [X] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [XD]US2006120812 (HECHT GIL [IL], et al) [XD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1702703 (SANDVIK INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY [SE]) [X] 1,8 * the whole document * |