EP2245043 - A METHOD OF PURIFYING A PEPTIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biocon Limited 20th K.M. Hosur Road Electronics City P.O. Bangalore 560 100 Karnataka / IN | [2010/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVE, Nitesh 424 Mahaveer Woods 22nd Main J P Nagar 5th Phase Near IDBI Bank Bangalore 560 078 Karnataka / IN | 02 /
VENKATESAN, Krishnamurthy Plot No.82 Door 22, Flat C Grace Enclave 2nd Main Road North Jaganathan Nagar Villivakkam Chennai 600 049 Tamil Nadu / IN | 03 /
NAGARAJAN, Ramprabu 1/117 West Street Chithiraipatty Thuraiyur T.K. Trichy District 621 010 Tamil Nadu / IN | 04 /
IYER, Harish 5C-221 3rd Main Road HRBR 3rd Block Bangalore 560 043 Karnataka / IN | [2010/44] | Representative(s) | Micheli & Cie SA Rue de Genève 122 Case Postale 61 1226 Genève-Thônex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/44] | Micheli & Cie SA Rue de Genève 122 C.P. 61 CH-1226 Genève-Thônex / CH | Application number, filing date | 08763712.0 | 26.03.2008 | [2010/44] | WO2008IN00191 | Priority number, date | INCH03112008 | 06.02.2008 Original published format: IN CH03112008 | [2010/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009098707 | Date: | 13.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2245043 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 13.08.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07K1/18, A61K38/00, C07K1/20, B01D15/32, B01D15/36, C07K1/36, C07K7/06, C07K14/57, C07K14/58 | [2011/19] | CPC: |
B01D15/325 (EP,US);
B01D15/362 (EP,US);
B01J20/285 (EP,US);
C07K1/18 (EP,US);
C07K1/20 (EP,US);
C07K1/36 (EP,US);
C07K14/57563 (EP,US);
C07K14/58 (EP,US);
C07K14/605 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/44] | C07K1/18, A61K38/00, C07K1/20, B01D15/32, B01D15/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/44] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG EINES PEPTIDS | [2010/44] | English: | A METHOD OF PURIFYING A PEPTIDE | [2010/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PURIFICATION D UN PEPTIDE | [2010/44] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2010 | Search fee paid | 12.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 12.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/44] | 26.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/07] | 15.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.04.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005019262 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-20 * examples 4-10,18-21 *; | [XI] - TERANISHI H ET AL, "Isolation and characterization of four VIP-related peptides from red-bellied newt, Cynops pyrrhogaster", REGULATORY PEPTIDES, ELSEVIER SCIENCE BV, NL, (20041215), vol. 123, no. 1-3, doi:10.1016/J.REGPEP.2004.04.024, ISSN 0167-0115, pages 173 - 179, XP004616089 [X] 1-16 * page 174, paragraph 2.3.1 * [I] 17-20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.regpep.2004.04.024 | International search | [A]JPH06256399 ; | [X]US6492327 (JUNKER LOUIS [US], et al); | [X]US2006211616 (STABY ARNE [DK], et al); | [X]WO2007071767 (NOVO NORDISK HEALTHCARE AG [CH], et al) | [A] - OHGURO, H. ET AL., "Separation of phospho- and non- phosphopeptides using reverse phase column chromatography", FEBS LETTERS, (1995), vol. 368, pages 452 - 454 | [A] - KUBAN, P. ET AL., "Application of gradient programs for the determination of underivatized amino acids and small peptides in reversed-phase high- performance liquid chromatography with contactless conductivity detection", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY A, (2006), vol. 1128, pages 97 - 104 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, & JP6256399 A 19940913 (TORAY IND INC) | Examination | WO2005100388 | WO2006119388 | WO2007009946 | WO2008109079 | - GREGORY A GRANT (ED) ED - GREGORY A GRANT (ED), Purification, SYNTHETIC PEPTIDES: A USER'S GUIDE, FREEMAN, NEW YORK, US, PAGE(S) 223 - 227, (19920101), ISBN 0-7167-7009-1, XP008168434 |