EP2299878 - ESPRESSO COFFEE MACHINE WITH PREINFUSION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states La Marzocco S.r.l. Viale Giacomo Matteotti 25 50121 Firenze / IT | [2012/11] |
Former [2011/13] | For all designated states La Marzocco S.r.l. Via Angiolo Tavanti 16 50134 Firenze / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAMBI, Piero Via Bellosguardo 30 50019 Sesto Fiorentino (FI) / IT | [2011/26] |
Former [2011/13] | 01 /
BAMBI, Piero Via Bellosguardo 30 I-50019 Sesto Fiorentino (FI) / IT | Representative(s) | Martini, Riccardo Brema SRL Piazza Enriquez, 22/c 47891 Dogana / SM | [N/P] |
Former [2011/46] | Martini, Riccardo Brema SRL Piazza Enriquez, 22/c 47891 Dogana / SM | ||
Former [2011/13] | Martini, Riccardo Brema SRL Piazza Enriquez, 22/c 47891 Dogana / SM | Application number, filing date | 08763849.0 | 30.04.2008 | [2011/13] | WO2008IT00297 | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009133578 | Date: | 05.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2299878 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2299878 | Date: | 16.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/00, A47J31/46, A47J31/36 | [2011/13] | CPC: |
A47J31/002 (EP,KR,US);
A47J31/3671 (EP,KR,US);
A47J31/46 (KR);
A47J31/461 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/13] | Extension states | RS | 26.11.2010 | Title | German: | ESPRESSO-KAFFEEMASCHINE MIT VOR-AUFGUSSVORRICHTUNG | [2011/13] | English: | ESPRESSO COFFEE MACHINE WITH PREINFUSION DEVICE | [2011/13] | French: | MACHINE À CAFÉ ESPRESSO AVEC DISPOSITIF DE PRÉ-INFUSION | [2011/13] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/13] | 07.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.04.2008 | BE | 16.11.2011 | CY | 16.11.2011 | CZ | 16.11.2011 | EE | 16.11.2011 | FI | 16.11.2011 | HR | 16.11.2011 | LT | 16.11.2011 | LV | 16.11.2011 | PL | 16.11.2011 | SI | 16.11.2011 | SK | 16.11.2011 | BG | 16.02.2012 | GR | 17.02.2012 | IS | 16.03.2012 | PT | 16.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2013/29] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
FI | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 16.11.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3230974 (ERNESTO VALENTE [IT]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0934719 (CIMBALI SPA [IT]) [DA] 1* paragraphs [0014] - [0025] - [0034] - [0042]; figures 1,2 * |