EP2166608 - FUEL CELL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.2014 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/12] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Katsumi Kozu c/o Panasonic Corporation I.P.R.O.C IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower ,1-61,Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku,Osaka -shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
Fukuda Shinsuke c/o Panasonic Corporation I.P.R.O.C IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower ,1-61,shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku,Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2010/21] |
Former [2010/12] | 01 /
Katsumi Kozu c/o Panasonic Corporation IP development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower ,1-61,Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku,Osaka -shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
02 /
Fukuda shinsuke c/o Panasonic Corporation IP development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower ,1-61,shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku,Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/12] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08763902.7 | 26.05.2008 | [2010/12] | WO2008JP01302 | Priority number, date | JP20070159797 | 18.06.2007 Original published format: JP 2007159797 | [2010/12] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008155875 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2166608 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B01D61/00, H01M8/04 | [2013/09] | CPC: |
B01D19/0042 (EP,US);
H01M8/04171 (EP,US);
H01M8/04164 (EP,US);
H01M8/04186 (EP,US);
H01M8/1011 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/12] | H01M8/06, B01D61/00, H01M8/04, H01M8/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/12] | Title | German: | BRENNSTOFFZELLENSYSTEM | [2010/12] | English: | FUEL CELL SYSTEM | [2010/12] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PILE À COMBUSTIBLE | [2010/12] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2009 | Translation filed | 02.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2009 | Search fee paid | 02.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/12] | 29.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/09] | 07.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005026027 (SATO YUUSUKE [JP]) [X] 1,4,5 * paragraphs [0020] - [0029]; figure 1 *; | [X]US2003031908 (BOSTAPH JOSEPH W [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0017] , [0018] , [0022]; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2004115506 (MIYAZAKI KANAME [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * paragraphs [0035] , [0 36] , [0 64]; figure 7 *; | [X]US2006204817 (YAMAGUCHI ATSUSHI [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * paragraphs [0059] , [0 75] , [0 87] , [0088]; figure 10 *; | [X]US2006188759 (HISANO TAISHI [JP]) [X] 1,3-6 * paragraphs [0035] - [0039] - [0 48] , [0 55] - [0058]; figure 4 *; | [XPL]US2007287054 (UEDA HIDEYUKI [JP], et al) [XP] 1,2,4,5 * paragraphs [0029] - [0041]; figures 1,2 * [L] | International search | [X]JP2005032718 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]JP2006236743 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [XP]JP2007329002 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2006066318 (SONY CORP); | [A]JP2005032606 (SONY CORP) | by applicant | JP2004349267 |