EP2141472 - TIRE ACTION FORCE DETECTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISONO, Hiroshi c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2010/01] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 08764254.2 | 25.04.2008 | [2010/01] | WO2008JP58445 | Priority number, date | JP20070115413 | 25.04.2007 Original published format: JP 2007115413 | [2010/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008133353 | Date: | 06.11.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2141472 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01L5/00, G01L5/16, G01M17/02 | [2013/33] | CPC: |
G01M17/021 (EP,US);
G01L5/164 (EP,US);
G01L5/169 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/01] | G01L5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER WIRKUNGSKRAFT VON REIFEN | [2010/01] | English: | TIRE ACTION FORCE DETECTING DEVICE | [2010/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION DE FORCE D'ACTION DE PNEU | [2010/01] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2009 | Translation filed | 29.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 29.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2009 | Examination requested [2010/01] | 29.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/15] | 04.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/15] | Divisional application(s) | EP14153285.3 / EP2730903 | EP17166541.7 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.12.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2018 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2004142577 (NSK LTD) [X] 1-5,7,9,11,13 * paragraphs [0049] - [0052]; figures 13,14,16 * [I] 6,8,10,12; | [X]GB2190201 (YAMATO SCALE CO LTD) [X] 1-4 * page 2, lines 7-53; figures 1,2 *; | [X]GB2260409 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [X] 1-13 * pages 9-17; figures 1-6 * | International search | [X]JP2004142577 (NSK LTD); | [X]JP2003246201 (NSK LTD); | [Y]JPH0641898B (DAIMLER BENZ AG) | by applicant | JP2003014563 | JP2005249517 | JP2005274492 |