EP2184559 - AIR CONDITIONING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | [2020/43] |
Former [2010/19] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIKAWA, Kazuya c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | 02 /
OKUNO, Toshiharu c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | 03 /
SETSU, Michio c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | 04 /
UEHARA, Yuhji c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | [2020/43] |
Former [2010/19] | 01 /
YOSHIKAWA, Kazuya c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka, 545-8522 / JP | ||
02 /
OKUNO, Toshiharu c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka, 545-8522 / JP | |||
03 /
SETSU, Michio c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka, 545-8522 / JP | |||
04 /
UEHARA, Yuhji c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka, 545-8522 / JP | Representative(s) | Treeby, Philip David William, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/43] | Treeby, Philip David William, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2010/19] | Treeby, Philip David William, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08764726.9 | 27.05.2008 | [2010/19] | WO2008JP59693 | Priority number, date | JP20070232690 | 07.09.2007 Original published format: JP 2007232690 | JP20070232698 | 07.09.2007 Original published format: JP 2007232698 | JP20070232717 | 07.09.2007 Original published format: JP 2007232717 | [2010/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009031343 | Date: | 12.03.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2184559 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2184559 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.03.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F24F1/0011, F24F1/0057, F24F13/20, F24F13/14 | [2020/23] | CPC: |
F24F1/0011 (EP);
F24F1/0057 (EP);
F24F13/1426 (EP);
F24F2013/1446 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/19] | F24F13/20, F24F13/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/43] |
Former [2010/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KLIMAANLAGENVORRICHTUNG | [2010/19] | English: | AIR CONDITIONING APPARATUS | [2010/19] | French: | APPAREIL DE CONDITIONNEMENT D'AIR | [2010/19] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2010 | Translation filed | 26.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2010 | Search fee paid | 26.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/19] | 27.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.05.2020 | Opposition(s) | 22.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.05.2008 | AT | 21.10.2020 | CY | 21.10.2020 | CZ | 21.10.2020 | DK | 21.10.2020 | EE | 21.10.2020 | ES | 21.10.2020 | HR | 21.10.2020 | IT | 21.10.2020 | LT | 21.10.2020 | LV | 21.10.2020 | MC | 21.10.2020 | MT | 21.10.2020 | NL | 21.10.2020 | PL | 21.10.2020 | RO | 21.10.2020 | SI | 21.10.2020 | SK | 21.10.2020 | BG | 21.01.2021 | NO | 21.01.2021 | GR | 22.01.2021 | IS | 21.02.2021 | PT | 22.02.2021 | GB | 27.05.2021 | IE | 27.05.2021 | LU | 27.05.2021 | BE | 31.05.2021 | CH | 31.05.2021 | FR | 31.05.2021 | LI | 31.05.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2023/29] | HU | 27.05.2008 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CY | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
GB | 27.05.2021 | ||
IE | 27.05.2021 | ||
LU | 27.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
FR | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
CY | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
GB | 27.05.2021 | ||
IE | 27.05.2021 | ||
LU | 27.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
FR | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
GB | 27.05.2021 | ||
IE | 27.05.2021 | ||
LU | 27.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
FR | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
GB | 27.05.2021 | ||
IE | 27.05.2021 | ||
LU | 27.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
FR | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
GB | 27.05.2021 | ||
IE | 27.05.2021 | ||
LU | 27.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
IE | 27.05.2021 | ||
LU | 27.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
LU | 27.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
LU | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | LV | 21.10.2020 | |
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | NL | 21.10.2020 | |
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | NL | 21.10.2020 | |
PT | 22.02.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH08247491 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2004263924 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2007120896 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-16* the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPH08247491 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD); | [Y]JP2002295888 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [Y]JP2003074962 (TOSHIBA CARRIER KK); | [A]JP2007120896 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2005315536 |