EP2154596 - INSERT MOLDING AND ITS MANUFACTURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/07] | INSERT MOLDING LAMINATE AND ITS MANUFACTURING METHOD, AND, INSERT MOLDING AND ITS MANUFACTURING METHOD | ||
[2018/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSHA PRINTING CO., LTD. 3, Mibu Hanai-cho Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 604-8551 / JP | [2010/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIMURA, Takeshi c/o NISSHA PRINTING CO. LTD. 3 Mibu Hanai-cho Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 604-8551 / JP | [2019/27] |
Former [2010/07] | 01 /
NISHIMURA, Takeshi c/o NISSHA PRINTING CO. LTD. 3 Mibu Hanai-cho Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 604-8551 / JP | Representative(s) | LBP Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Siegfried-Kühn-Straße 4 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/27] | Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Siegfried-Kühn-Straße 4 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
Former [2010/07] | Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Bismarckstrasse 16 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 08764898.6 | 30.05.2008 | [2010/07] | WO2008JP59980 | Priority number, date | JP20070144878 | 31.05.2007 Original published format: JP 2007144878 | [2010/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008149789 | Date: | 11.12.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2154596 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2154596 | Date: | 03.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/041, B29C45/14 | [2010/07] | CPC: |
B29C45/14639 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/044 (EP,KR,US);
B29K2709/08 (EP,KR,US);
B29K2715/006 (EP,KR,US);
B29L2031/3481 (EP,KR,US);
G06F2203/04103 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/27] |
Former [2010/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | UMSPRITZEN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2018/47] | English: | INSERT MOLDING AND ITS MANUFACTURING METHOD | [2018/47] | French: | MOULAGE D'INSERT ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2018/47] |
Former [2010/07] | UMSPRITZLAMINAT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR SOWIE UMSPRITZEN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | ||
Former [2010/07] | INSERT MOLDING LAMINATE AND ITS MANUFACTURING METHOD, AND, INSERT MOLDING AND ITS MANUFACTURING METHOD | ||
Former [2010/07] | STRATIFIÉ DE MOULAGE D'INSERT ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION, ET, MOULAGE D'INSERT ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | Entry into regional phase | 06.01.2009 | Translation filed | 21.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2009 | Search fee paid | 21.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/07] | 04.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.11.2018 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.05.2008 | AT | 03.07.2019 | CY | 03.07.2019 | CZ | 03.07.2019 | DK | 03.07.2019 | EE | 03.07.2019 | ES | 03.07.2019 | FI | 03.07.2019 | HR | 03.07.2019 | IT | 03.07.2019 | LT | 03.07.2019 | LV | 03.07.2019 | MC | 03.07.2019 | MT | 03.07.2019 | NL | 03.07.2019 | PL | 03.07.2019 | RO | 03.07.2019 | SE | 03.07.2019 | SI | 03.07.2019 | SK | 03.07.2019 | TR | 03.07.2019 | BG | 03.10.2019 | NO | 03.10.2019 | GR | 04.10.2019 | IS | 03.11.2019 | PT | 04.11.2019 | IE | 30.05.2020 | LU | 30.05.2020 | BE | 31.05.2020 | CH | 31.05.2020 | LI | 31.05.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2021/24] | AT | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
IE | 30.05.2020 | ||
LU | 30.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
IE | 30.05.2020 | ||
LU | 30.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AT | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
LU | 30.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AT | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AT | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AT | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AT | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 03.07.2019 | |
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 03.07.2019 | |
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | NL | 03.07.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2004265602 (KOBAYASHI TAICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2,4 * the whole document * [A] 6,7,9-11; | [YA]EP1698965 (NISSHA PRINTING [JP]) [Y] 1,2,4 * the whole document *[A] 6,7,9-11 | International search | [A]JPH02249616 (TAKAGI SEIKO KK); | [A]JPH0418628 (NITTO DENKO CORP); | [A]JPH0547815U ; | [A]JPH05324203 (FUJITSU LTD); | [A]JP2005222266 (SHARP KK) | by applicant | JP2006294799 |