EP2189953 - PAPER SHEET DIVIDING MECHANISM, PAPER SHEET HANDLING DEVICE, AND PAPER SHEET DIVIDING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Glory Ltd. 3-1 Shimoteno 1-chome Himeji-shi Hyogo 670-8567 / JP | [2010/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKAZAWA, Masaaki C/O GLORY LTD. 3-1 Shimoteno 1-chome Himeji-shi Hyogo 670-8567 / JP | 02 /
KOBAYASHI, Toshihiko C/O GLORY LTD. 3-1 Shimoteno 1-chome Himeji-shi Hyogo 670-8567 / JP | 03 /
MIZORO, Tsuguo C/O GLORY LTD. 3-1 Shimoteno 1-chome Himeji-shi Hyogo 670-8567 / JP | 04 /
UTSUMI, Hisayuki C/O GLORY LTD. 3-1 Shimoteno 1-chome Himeji-shi Hyogo 670-8567 / JP | [2016/32] |
Former [2010/21] | 01 /
FUKAZAWA, Masaaki C/O GLORY LTD. 3-1 Shimoteno 1-chome Himeji-shi Hyogo 670-8567 / JP | ||
02 /
KOBAYASHI, Toshihiko C/O GLORY LTD. 3-1 Shimoteno 1-chome Himeji-shi Hyogo 670-8567 / JP | |||
03 /
MIZORO, Tsuguo C/O GLORY LTD. 3-1 Shimoteno 1-chome Himeji-shi Hyogo 670-8567 / JP | |||
04 /
UTSUMI, Hisayuki C/O GLORY LTD. 3-1 Shimoteno 1-chome Himeji-shi Hyogo 670-8567 / JP | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/32] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/21] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08765710.2 | 18.06.2008 | [2010/21] | WO2008JP61093 | Priority number, date | JP20070236653 | 12.09.2007 Original published format: JP 2007236653 | [2010/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009034758 | Date: | 19.03.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2189953 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2189953 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.03.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G07D11/00, B65H29/58, B65H29/60 | [2012/03] | CPC: |
B65H43/08 (EP,US);
B65H29/58 (EP,US);
B65H29/60 (EP,US);
G07D11/18 (EP,US);
B65H2301/3125 (EP,US);
B65H2301/44822 (EP,US);
B65H2403/421 (EP,US);
B65H2403/512 (EP,US);
B65H2403/942 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/21] | G07D9/00, B65H29/60 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/32] |
Former [2010/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | PAPIERBLATT-AUFTEILUNGSEINRICHTUNG, PAPIERBLATT-HANDHABUNGSEINRICHTUNG UND PAPIERBLATT-AUFTEILUNGSVERFAHREN | [2010/21] | English: | PAPER SHEET DIVIDING MECHANISM, PAPER SHEET HANDLING DEVICE, AND PAPER SHEET DIVIDING METHOD | [2010/21] | French: | MÉCANISME DE TRI DE FEUILLES DE PAPIER, DISPOSITIF DE MANIPULATION DE FEUILLES DE PAPIER ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRI DE FEUILLES DE PAPIER | [2010/21] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2010 | Translation filed | 12.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 12.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/21] | 03.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 06.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP16171719.4 / EP3089125 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.06.2008 | AT | 10.08.2016 | BE | 10.08.2016 | CY | 10.08.2016 | CZ | 10.08.2016 | DK | 10.08.2016 | EE | 10.08.2016 | ES | 10.08.2016 | FI | 10.08.2016 | HR | 10.08.2016 | LT | 10.08.2016 | LV | 10.08.2016 | MC | 10.08.2016 | NL | 10.08.2016 | PL | 10.08.2016 | RO | 10.08.2016 | SE | 10.08.2016 | SI | 10.08.2016 | SK | 10.08.2016 | TR | 10.08.2016 | BG | 10.11.2016 | NO | 10.11.2016 | GR | 11.11.2016 | IS | 10.12.2016 | PT | 12.12.2016 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 18.06.2008 | |
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CY | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 18.06.2008 | |
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 10.08.2016 | |
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 10.08.2016 | |
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 10.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4871163 (LANDA BENZION [CA], et al) [X] 1,3,13-15 * the whole document * [I] 2,4-11; | [A]JPH07187470 (KOFU NIPPON DENKI KK) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XI]WO0165493 (CASHCODE CO INC [CA], et al) [X] 1,3,13-15 * page 6, line 1 - line 19 * * page 12, line 35 - page 13, line 31 * * figures 3,9-11,13 * [I] 2,4-11; | [XI]EP1445223 (XEROX CORP [US]) [X] 1,3,13-15 * paragraph [0029] * * figure - * [I] 2,4-11 | International search | [A]JPH04141468 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND); | [A]JPH07187470 (KOFU NIPPON DENKI KK); | [A]JP2005179063 (PALO ALTO RES CT INC) |