EP2155992 - TAILGATE STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2011 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama, 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/08] | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Mitsuyoshi c/o Honda R&D Co. Ltd. 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | [2010/08] | Representative(s) | Trossin, Hans-Jürgen, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/08] | Trossin, Hans-Jürgen, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08765732.6 | 12.06.2008 | [2010/08] | WO2008JP61166 | Priority number, date | JP20070155180 | 12.06.2007 Original published format: JP 2007155180 | [2010/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008153197 | Date: | 18.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2155992 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2155992 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | E05B65/19, B60J5/10 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
B60J5/107 (EP,US);
E05B83/16 (EP,US);
E05B53/00 (EP,US);
E05B85/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2010/21] |
Former [2010/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | HECKKLAPPENSTRUKTUR | [2010/45] | English: | TAILGATE STRUCTURE | [2010/08] | French: | STRUCTURE DE HAYON | [2010/08] |
Former [2010/08] | HECKSTRUKTUR | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2009 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 03.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003173796 (HARIMA ISSEI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figures 2-4,7,8,15,18; claims 1-3 * * paragraphs [0030] , [0092] - [0099] - [0108] , [0118] , [0121] *; | [A]US2003071481 (IGARASHI KAZUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figures 2,3; claim 1 * * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] *; | [A]US2003107235 (KOMATSU HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1-3,17; claim 1 * * paragraphs [0075] , [0083] , [0092] * |