EP2153480 - MIDDLE OR LARGE-SIZED BATTERY PACK CASE PROVIDING IMPROVED DISTRIBUTION UNIFORMITY OF COOLANT FLUX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, SE, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 20, Yoido-dong Youngdungpo-gu, Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2010/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IM, Ye Hoon 705-15 Geumseong Baekjo Yemiji Apt. Gwanpyeong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-509 / KR | 02 /
CHOI, Dooseong 6-404 LG Chem Sawon Apt. Doryong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-340 / KR | 03 /
HAN, Sang Phil 304-601 Expo Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-761 / KR | 04 /
YOON, Jongmoon 2-4 Yongdu-dong Jung-gu Daejeon 301-830 / KR | 05 /
AHN, Jaesung 6-303 LG Chem Sawon Apt. Doryong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-340 / KR | 06 /
YANG, Heekook 3-108 LG Chem Sawon Apt. Doryong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-340 / KR | 07 /
KANG, Dal Mo 110-902 Chonggu Narae Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-729 / KR | [2015/15] |
Former [2010/07] | 01 /
IM, Ye Hoon 705-15 Geumseong Baekjo Yemiji Apt. Gwanpyeong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-509 / KR | ||
02 /
CHOI, Dooseong 6-404 LG Chem Sawon Apt. Doryong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-340 / KR | |||
03 /
HAN, Sang Phil 304-601 Expo Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-761 / KR | |||
04 /
YOON, Jongmoon 2-4 Yongdu-dong Jung-gu Daejeon 301-830 / KR | |||
05 /
AHN, Jaesung 6-303 LG Chem Sawon Apt. Doryong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-340 / KR | |||
06 /
YANG, Heekook 3-108 LG Chem Sawon Apt. Doryong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-340 / KR | |||
07 /
KANG, Dal Mo 110-902 Chonggu Narae Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-729 / KR | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/15] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2010/07] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08766246.6 | 12.06.2008 | [2010/07] | WO2008KR03284 | Priority number, date | KR20070058077 | 14.06.2007 Original published format: KR 20070058077 | [2010/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008153326 | Date: | 18.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2153480 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2153480 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.02.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/10, H01M10/60, H01M10/613, H01M10/6563, H01M10/6566, // H01M10/052, H01M10/34 | [2014/48] | CPC: |
H01M10/6563 (EP,US);
H01M10/613 (EP,US);
H01M10/6566 (EP,US);
H01M50/209 (EP,US);
H01M50/211 (EP,US);
H01M10/052 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/48] | H01M10/50, H01M2/02, H01M2/10 | ||
Former IPC [2010/07] | H01M2/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MITTELGROSSES ODER GROSSES BATTERIEPACKGEHÄUSE MIT VERBESSERTER VERTEILUNGSGLEICHMÄSSIGKEIT EINES KÜHLMITTELSTROMS | [2010/07] | English: | MIDDLE OR LARGE-SIZED BATTERY PACK CASE PROVIDING IMPROVED DISTRIBUTION UNIFORMITY OF COOLANT FLUX | [2010/07] | French: | BOÎTIER DE BLOC-BATTERIE DE MOYENNE OU GRANDE DIMENSION CONFÉRANT UNE MEILLEURE UNIFORMITÉ DE DISTRIBUTION DU FLUX DE LIQUIDE DE REFROIDISSEMENT | [2010/07] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2009 | Search fee paid | 07.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/07] | 13.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 11.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.06.2008 | AT | 08.04.2015 | BE | 08.04.2015 | BG | 08.04.2015 | CY | 08.04.2015 | CZ | 08.04.2015 | DK | 08.04.2015 | EE | 08.04.2015 | ES | 08.04.2015 | FI | 08.04.2015 | HR | 08.04.2015 | IT | 08.04.2015 | LT | 08.04.2015 | LV | 08.04.2015 | MC | 08.04.2015 | MT | 08.04.2015 | NL | 08.04.2015 | PL | 08.04.2015 | RO | 08.04.2015 | SE | 08.04.2015 | SI | 08.04.2015 | SK | 08.04.2015 | TR | 08.04.2015 | IE | 12.06.2015 | LU | 12.06.2015 | CH | 30.06.2015 | LI | 30.06.2015 | NO | 08.07.2015 | GR | 09.07.2015 | IS | 08.08.2015 | PT | 10.08.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
BE | 08.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
MT | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
IE | 12.06.2015 | ||
LU | 12.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
BE | 08.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
IE | 12.06.2015 | ||
LU | 12.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
IE | 12.06.2015 | ||
LU | 12.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
IE | 12.06.2015 | ||
LU | 12.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
IE | 12.06.2015 | ||
LU | 12.06.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
LU | 12.06.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 08.04.2015 | |
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 08.04.2015 | |
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 08.04.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JP2000067934 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1,4,8,10,11 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0021]; figure 1 * [Y] 9 [I] 2,12,13; | [Y]EP1553655 (TOSHIBA BATTERY [JP], et al) [Y] 9 * paragraph [0023] *; | [XAI]WO2006080679 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [X] 1,3-6,8,10-13 * page 4, line 2 - page 7, line 11 * * page 8, line 10 - page 10, line 17; figure 2 * [A] 7 [I] 2; | [XP]US2007202792 (SHIMIZU HIDEO [JP], et al) [XP] 1,4,5,10-13* the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2001283937 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-13 * See abstract, Figures 1,2 and claims 1-18 *; | [A]KR20040031078 (OVONIC BATTERY CO., Ltd.) [A] 1-13 * See abstract, Figures 11,12 and claims 1-9 *; | [A]US2006115716 (KIM TAE-YONG [KR], et al) [A] 1-13* See abstract, Figures 1-3, and claims 1-19 * |