EP2158702 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR DISCONTINUOUS RECEPTION IN MOBILE TELCOMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.12.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/39] |
Former [2010/09] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Soeng-Hun@c/o Samsung Electronics Co.Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | 02 /
VAN LIESHOUT, Gert Jan@c/o Samsung Electronics Co.Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Ju-Ho@c/o Samsung Electronics Co.Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | 04 /
HEO, Youn-Hyoung@c/o Samsung Electronics Co.Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [2020/08] |
Former [2010/09] | 01 /
KIM, Soeng-Hun c/o Samsung Electronics Co.Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | ||
02 /
VAN LIESHOUT, Gert Jan c/o Samsung Electronics Co.Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | |||
03 /
LEE, Ju-Ho c/o Samsung Electronics Co.Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | |||
04 /
HEO, Youn-Hyoung c/o Samsung Electronics Co.Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2020/08] |
Former [2010/09] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08766495.9 | 20.06.2008 | [2010/09] | WO2008KR03536 | Priority number, date | KR20070060810 | 20.06.2007 Original published format: KR 20070060810 | KR20070087644 | 30.08.2007 Original published format: KR 20070087644 | [2010/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008156339 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2158702 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2158702 | Date: | 19.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/26, H04W52/02 | [2015/04] | CPC: |
H04L5/0091 (EP,US);
H04L1/18 (KR);
H04W52/02 (KR);
H04W52/0216 (EP,US);
H04W52/0248 (US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/09] | H04B7/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/08] |
Former [2010/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR DISKONTINUIERLICHEN EMPFANG IN EINEM MOBILTELEKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2010/09] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR DISCONTINUOUS RECEPTION IN MOBILE TELCOMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2010/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉS À DES APPLICATIONS DE RÉCEPTION DISCONTINUE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE TÉLÉCOMMUNICATION MOBILE | [2010/09] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2009 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/09] | 21.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.09.2019 | 11.09.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 26.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.07.2018 | Opposition(s) | 20.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.06.2008 | AT | 19.02.2020 | CY | 19.02.2020 | CZ | 19.02.2020 | DK | 19.02.2020 | EE | 19.02.2020 | ES | 19.02.2020 | FI | 19.02.2020 | HR | 19.02.2020 | IT | 19.02.2020 | LT | 19.02.2020 | LV | 19.02.2020 | MC | 19.02.2020 | MT | 19.02.2020 | NL | 19.02.2020 | PL | 19.02.2020 | RO | 19.02.2020 | SE | 19.02.2020 | SI | 19.02.2020 | SK | 19.02.2020 | TR | 19.02.2020 | BG | 19.05.2020 | NO | 19.05.2020 | GR | 20.05.2020 | IS | 19.06.2020 | IE | 20.06.2020 | LU | 20.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | FR | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | PT | 12.07.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2022/26] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
IT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
TR | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
IE | 20.06.2020 | ||
LU | 20.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
FR | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
IT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
IE | 20.06.2020 | ||
LU | 20.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
FR | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
IT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
IE | 20.06.2020 | ||
LU | 20.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
IT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
LU | 20.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
IT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 19.02.2020 | |
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 19.02.2020 | |
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 19.02.2020 | |
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 19.02.2020 | |
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
NO | 19.05.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007133479 (MONTOJO JUAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0015] ** paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0062] *; | [XY] - ERICSSON, "DRX control for LTE_ACTIVE and VoIP", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-071818, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070504), vol. RAN WG2, no. Kobe, Japan; 20070504, XP050134715 [X] 1,5,9-11,13-15 * Sections 1 and 2 * [Y] 2-4,6-8,12,16 | [Y] - ALCATEL-LUCENT, "Persistent DL Scheduling and VoIP", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-071368_PERSISTENT_DL_SCHEDULING_VOIP, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070322), vol. RAN WG2, no. St. Julian; 20070322, XP050134310 [Y] 2-4,6-8,12,16 * Sections 1 and 2 * | International search | [A]EP1499144 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | [A]US7230932 (NUMMINEN JUSSI [FI]); | [A] - SUCKCHEL ET AL., "Adaptive discontinuous reception mechanisms for power saving in UMTS", COMMUNICATIONS LETTERS, IEEE, (200701), vol. 11, no. 1, pages 40 - 42, XP011171854 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LCOMM.2007.061258 |