EP2170244 - PROCESS FOR APPLYING ADHESION COATING TO A SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUT JOZEF STEFAN Jamova 39 1000 Ljubljana / SI | [2010/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOSMAC, Tomaz Smlednik 79 1216 Smlednik / SI | 02 /
KRNEL, Kristoffer Poljanski nasip 14 1000 Ljubljana / SI | 03 /
KOCJAN, Andraz Sarhova 30 1000 Ljubljana / SI | 04 /
JEVNIKAR, Peter Slomskova 23 1000 Ljubljana / SI | [2010/14] | Representative(s) | Liedl, Christine Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/14] | Liedl, Christine Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08767316.6 | 03.06.2008 | [2010/14] | WO2008SI00032 | Priority number, date | SI20070000154 | 28.06.2007 Original published format: SI 200700154 | [2010/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009002278 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2170244 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2170244 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/04 | [2010/14] | CPC: |
A61K6/818 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/14] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM AUFBRINGEN EINER ADHÄSIONSSCHICHT AUF EINEM SUBSTRAT | [2010/14] | English: | PROCESS FOR APPLYING ADHESION COATING TO A SUBSTRATE | [2010/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'APPLICATION D'UN REVÊTEMENT D'ADHÉSION SUR UN SUBSTRAT | [2010/14] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 06.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.03.2011 | BE | 30.03.2011 | CY | 30.03.2011 | CZ | 30.03.2011 | DK | 30.03.2011 | EE | 30.03.2011 | FI | 30.03.2011 | HR | 30.03.2011 | HU | 30.03.2011 | IT | 30.03.2011 | LT | 30.03.2011 | LV | 30.03.2011 | MT | 30.03.2011 | NL | 30.03.2011 | PL | 30.03.2011 | RO | 30.03.2011 | SI | 30.03.2011 | SK | 30.03.2011 | TR | 30.03.2011 | IE | 03.06.2011 | LU | 03.06.2011 | BG | 30.06.2011 | FR | 30.06.2011 | MC | 30.06.2011 | NO | 30.06.2011 | GR | 01.07.2011 | ES | 11.07.2011 | IS | 30.07.2011 | PT | 01.08.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
MT | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
TR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IE | 03.06.2011 | ||
LU | 03.06.2011 | ||
BG | 30.06.2011 | ||
FR | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
MT | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
IE | 03.06.2011 | ||
LU | 03.06.2011 | ||
BG | 30.06.2011 | ||
FR | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
MT | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
IE | 03.06.2011 | ||
LU | 03.06.2011 | ||
FR | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
MT | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
IE | 03.06.2011 | ||
FR | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
MT | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
IE | 03.06.2011 | ||
FR | 30.06.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
MT | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
IE | 03.06.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
MT | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
MT | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | HR | 30.03.2011 | |
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6413660 (DASKALON GREGG [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A] - RUDDELL, THOMPSON, STONER, "MECHANICAL PROPERTIES OF A DENTAL CERAMIC COATED BY RF MAGNETRON SPUTTERING", J. OF BIOMEDICAL MATERIAL RES., (20000622), vol. 51, no. 3, pages 316 - 320, XP002554265 [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - BOWEN, HIGHFIELD, MOCELLIN, RING, "DEGRADATION OF ALUMINIUM NITRIDE POWDER IN AN AQUEOUS ENVIRONMENT", J. AM. CERAM. SOC., (19900301), vol. 73, no. 3, pages 724 - 728, XP002554118 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1151-2916.1990.tb06579.x | [A] - FREEMAN, BROOK, "BONE RESPONSE TO A TITANIUM ALUMINIUM NITRIDE COATING ON METALLIC IMPLANTS", J. MATER. SCI. : MATER. MED., (20060501), vol. 17, no. 5, pages 465 - 470, XP002554119 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/S10856-006-8474-9 |