EP2165388 - TRIPLE STAGGER OFFSETABLE AZIMUTH BEAM WIDTH CONTROLLED ANTENNA FOR WIRELESS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.06.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, PT | published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2015/18] |
Former [2015/17] | For all designated states Powerwave Technologies S.a.r.l. 296-298 Route de Longwy 1940 Luxembourg City / LU | ||
Former [2015/15] | For all designated states P-Wave Holdings, LLC 10877 Wilshire Boulevard 18th Floor Los Angeles, CA 90024 / US | ||
Former [2010/12] | For all designated states Powerwave Technologies, Inc. 1801 E. St. Andrew Place Santa Ana, CA 92705 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DENG, Gang Yi 15302 Touraine Way Irvine, CA 92604 / US | 02 /
RABINOVICH, Alexander 6443 Anguilla Avenue Cypress, CA 90630 / US | 03 /
HUNT, Nando 202 1/2 E. 15th Street Newport Beach, CA 92663 / US | 04 /
DICKSON, JOHN, J. 6366 San Andres Cypress, CA 90630 / US | 05 /
WILSON, John Stewart 1106 Huntington Street Huntington beach, CA 92648 / US | [2010/12] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2018/03] |
Former [2010/12] | Janson, Ronny Ehrner & Delmar Patentbyrå AB Box 10316 100 55 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 08768385.0 | 11.06.2008 | [2010/12] | WO2008US07333 | Priority number, date | US20070934371P | 13.06.2007 Original published format: US 934371 P | [2010/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008156633 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2165388 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2165388 | Date: | 17.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.12.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q3/01, H01Q3/02, H01Q1/24, H01Q9/28, H01Q19/10, H01Q21/06, H01Q25/00 | [2017/25] | CPC: |
H01Q1/246 (EP,US);
H01Q3/02 (US);
H01Q19/104 (EP,US);
H01Q21/062 (EP,US);
H01Q25/002 (EP,US);
H01Q3/01 (EP,US);
H01Q9/285 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/23] | H01Q21/08, H01Q1/24 | ||
Former IPC [2010/12] | H01Q21/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/03] |
Former [2010/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | STRAHLBREITENGESTEUERTE ANTENNE MIT DREIFACH-STAFFELUNGS-VERSETZBAREM AZIMUT FÜR EIN DRAHTLOSES NETZ | [2010/12] | English: | TRIPLE STAGGER OFFSETABLE AZIMUTH BEAM WIDTH CONTROLLED ANTENNA FOR WIRELESS NETWORK | [2010/12] | French: | ANTENNE COMMANDÉE PAR LARGEUR DE FAISCEAU À AZIMUT DÉCALABLE À TRIPLE ÉTAGE POUR UN RÉSEAU SANS FIL | [2010/12] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2010 | Search fee paid | 07.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/12] | 04.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 18.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2013 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   30.12.2013 | 30.06.2014 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   11.09.2014 | 30.06.2017 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   07.12.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.06.2008 | AT | 17.01.2018 | CY | 17.01.2018 | CZ | 17.01.2018 | DK | 17.01.2018 | EE | 17.01.2018 | ES | 17.01.2018 | FI | 17.01.2018 | HR | 17.01.2018 | IT | 17.01.2018 | LT | 17.01.2018 | LV | 17.01.2018 | MC | 17.01.2018 | NL | 17.01.2018 | PL | 17.01.2018 | PT | 17.01.2018 | RO | 17.01.2018 | SE | 17.01.2018 | SI | 17.01.2018 | SK | 17.01.2018 | TR | 17.01.2018 | BG | 17.04.2018 | NO | 17.04.2018 | GR | 18.04.2018 | IS | 17.05.2018 | IE | 11.06.2018 | LU | 11.06.2018 | MT | 11.06.2018 | BE | 30.06.2018 | CH | 30.06.2018 | LI | 30.06.2018 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/16] | AT | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
TR | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
IE | 11.06.2018 | ||
LU | 11.06.2018 | ||
MT | 11.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
IE | 11.06.2018 | ||
LU | 11.06.2018 | ||
MT | 11.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
IE | 11.06.2018 | ||
LU | 11.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
IE | 11.06.2018 | ||
LU | 11.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
IE | 11.06.2018 | ||
LU | 11.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
LU | 11.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AT | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 17.01.2018 | |
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 17.01.2018 | |
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 17.01.2018 | |
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 17.01.2018 | |
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002008672 (GOTHARD GRIFFIN K [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 9, paragraph 109 - paragraph 112 * * figure 10 * * abstract *; | [A]FR2863110 (ARIALCOM [FR]) [A] 1-15 * page 4, line 28 - page 7, line 13 * * figures 1A-1C ** abstract *; | [I]US2006220976 (SCHADLER JOHN L [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 2, paragraph 18 - page 5, paragraph 34 * * figures 1-5 * * abstract * | International search | [Y]US5345248 (HWANG YEONG M [US], et al); | [A]US2005192727 (SHOSTAK OLEKSANDR T [UA], et al); | [A]US2006139224 (TIETJEN BYRON W [US]); | [X]US2007030208 (LINEHAN KEVIN E [US]) | by applicant | US5949303 |