EP2203255 - PROCESS FOR ADSORPTIVE BUBBLE SEPARATION USING A DENSE FOAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/27] | PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR ADSORPTIVE BUBBLE SEPARATION USING A DENSE FOAM | ||
[2017/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.02.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renewable Algal Energy, LLC 225 Rosehaven Court Kingport, TN 37663 / US | [2015/21] |
Former [2010/27] | For all designated states Renewable Algal Energy, LLC 225 Rosehaven Court Kingport, TN 37663 / US | ||
For all designated states Eastman Chemical Company 200 South Wilcox Drive Kingsport, TN 37660 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANEL, Jeffrey, S. 225 Rosehaven Court Kingsport, TN 37663 / US | 02 /
CLAYTON, Robert, L. 1161 W. Samalayuca Dr. Tucson, AZ 85704 / US | [2010/27] | Representative(s) | Ricker, Mathias Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/32] | Ricker, Mathias Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/27] | Ricker, Mathias Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Foerstl Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08768675.4 | 18.06.2008 | [2010/27] | WO2008US07708 | Priority number, date | US20070944813P | 19.06.2007 Original published format: US 944813 P | [2010/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008156835 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2203255 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2203255 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.03.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B03D1/02, C02F1/24, C12N1/02 | [2017/03] | CPC: |
B03D1/02 (EP,US);
B03D1/1412 (EP,US);
B03D1/1462 (EP,US);
B03D1/20 (EP,US);
B03D1/24 (EP,US);
C02F1/24 (EP,US);
C12M47/02 (EP,US);
C12N1/02 (EP,US);
C12N1/066 (EP,US);
C02F1/40 (EP,US);
C02F1/52 (EP,US);
C02F2101/20 (EP,US);
C02F2101/32 (EP,US);
C02F2103/10 (EP,US);
C02F2201/003 (EP,US);
C02F2209/38 (EP,US);
C02F2209/40 (EP,US);
C02F2301/063 (EP,US);
C02F2303/12 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/45] | B03D1/14, B03D1/24, C02F1/24, B01F3/04, A01G7/00, C12N1/06 | ||
Former IPC [2010/27] | B03D1/14, B03D1/24, C02F1/24, B01D19/00, B01F3/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/32] |
Former [2010/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ADSORPTIVEN BLASENABSCHEIDUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES DICHTEN SCHAUMS | [2017/03] | English: | PROCESS FOR ADSORPTIVE BUBBLE SEPARATION USING A DENSE FOAM | [2017/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA SÉPARATION À L'AIDE DE BULLES PAR ADSORPTION UTILISANT UNE MOUSSE DENSE | [2017/03] |
Former [2010/27] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ADSORPTIVEN BLASENABSCHEIDUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES DICHTEN SCHAUMS | ||
Former [2010/27] | PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR ADSORPTIVE BUBBLE SEPARATION USING A DENSE FOAM | ||
Former [2010/27] | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR LA SÉPARATION À L'AIDE DE BULLES PAR ADSORPTION UTILISANT UNE MOUSSE DENSE | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2010 | Search fee paid | 18.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/27] | 10.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.12.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16202875.7 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 10.01.2017 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/29] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 27.08.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 27.08.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.09.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.06.2008 | AT | 09.08.2017 | CY | 09.08.2017 | CZ | 09.08.2017 | DK | 09.08.2017 | EE | 09.08.2017 | FI | 09.08.2017 | HR | 09.08.2017 | IT | 09.08.2017 | LT | 09.08.2017 | LV | 09.08.2017 | MC | 09.08.2017 | NL | 09.08.2017 | PL | 09.08.2017 | RO | 09.08.2017 | SE | 09.08.2017 | SI | 09.08.2017 | SK | 09.08.2017 | TR | 09.08.2017 | BG | 09.11.2017 | NO | 09.11.2017 | GR | 10.11.2017 | IS | 09.12.2017 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 18.06.2008 | |
AT | 09.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
TR | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
TR | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 09.08.2017 | |
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 09.08.2017 | |
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 09.08.2017 | |
NO | 09.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - SCHULTZ ET AL, "The Flotation Column as a Froth Separator", SME,, ISSN 1335-440X, (19911201), pages 1449 - 1451, (20080304), XP008156310 [I] 1-15 * abstract * | International search | [A]US5240600 (WANG LAWRENCE K [US], et al) [A] 1-15* . Abstract: Claims *; | [A]US5910254 (GUELCHER SCOTT ARTHUR [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * . Abstract; column 8, lines 1-50; Claims *; | [A]US5951875 (KANEL JEFFREY SCOTT [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * . Abstract; column 8, lines 1-50; Claims *; | [A]US6524486 (BORODYANSKI GENADY [IL], et al) [A] 1-15 * . Abstract; Claims * | Examination | US4203837 | - G. J Harbort ET AL, "Recovery interactions between the froth zone, pulp zone and downcomer within a Jameson cell", Proceedings of the Tenth Australian Coal Preparation Conference, (20041001), pages 91 - 101, URL: http://espace.library.uq.edu.au/view/UQ:100095, (20141113), XP055152705 | - "Ellipsoidal Fluid particles", R. Clift, J.R. Grace and M.E. Weber, Bubbles, drops, and particles, Academic Press, (1978), pages 169 - 173 | - BISPERINK C G J ET AL, "Bubble-size distributions in foams", ADVANCES IN COLLOID AND INTERFACE SCIENCE 1992 MAR 23, (19920323), vol. 38, doi:10.1016/0001-8686(92)80040-5, pages 13 - 32 |