EP2155910 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR CHARACTERIZING AND REGULATING OLFACTORY SENSATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Duke University 2812 Erwin Road, Suite 306 Durham, NC 27705 / US | For all designated states The Rockefeller University 1230 York Avenue Founders Hall 502 New York, NY 10065 / US | [2010/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUNAMI, Hiroaki 4606 Sycamore Shoals Road Durham, North Carolina 27705 / US | 02 /
KELLER, Andreas 500 E 63rd Street, 6E New York, New York 10065 / US | 03 /
ZHUANG, Hanyi 5353 West Atlantic Avenue 402 Delray Beach, FL 33484 / US | 04 /
CHI, Qiuyi 5915 Lyon Farm Drive Durham, North Carolina 27713 / US | 05 /
VOSSHALL, Leslie, B. 15 West 104th Street, Apt. 3B New York, New York 10025 / US | [2010/13] |
Former [2010/08] | 01 /
MATSUNAMI, Hiroaki 4606 Sycamore Shoals Road Durham, North Carolina 27705 / US | ||
02 /
KELLER, Andreas 500 E 63rd Street, 6E New York, New York 10065 / US | |||
03 /
ZHUANG, Hanyi 1911 Erwin Road Apt. F Durham, North Carolina 27705 / US | |||
04 /
CHI, Qiuyi 5915 Lyon Farm Drive Durham, North Carolina 27713 / US | |||
05 /
VOSSHALL, Leslie, B. 15 West 104th Street, Apt. 3B New York, New York 10025 / US | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/08] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 08769336.2 | 08.05.2008 | [2010/08] | WO2008US63073 | Priority number, date | US20070928249P | 08.05.2007 Original published format: US 928249 P | [2010/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008137993 | Date: | 13.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2155910 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 13.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, G01N33/53, C12N5/06 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6876 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6897 (US);
G01N33/566 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/136 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/08] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR CHARAKTERISIERUNG UND REGULIERUNG DER GERUCHSWAHRNEHMUNG | [2010/08] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR CHARACTERIZING AND REGULATING OLFACTORY SENSATION | [2010/08] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT DE CARACTÉRISER ET DE RÉGULER UNE SENSATION OLFACTIVE | [2010/08] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2009 | Search fee paid | 08.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 30.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/22] | 10.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.11.2010 | 31.05.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO0127158 (DIGISCENTS [US], et al) [I] 6,10-13 * Seq Id No 1349, having 98.4% similarity to present OR7D4.;; claims 32, 33 *; | [X]WO0190187 (CURAGEN CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * Seq Id No 2.;; claims 1-4, 15-17, 22, 24, 30, 31, 34, 41-44; table 1 *; | [X]EP1612222 (CHEMCOM SA [BE]) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0036]; claims 1, 5-7, 12-14 *; | [A] - SAITO HARUMI ET AL, "RTP family members induce functional expression of mammalian odorant receptors", CELL, (20041124), vol. 119, no. 5, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 679 - 691, XP002577591 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2004.11.021 | International search | [A]US2005176009 (LANCET DORON [IL], et al); | [A] - TSVIYA OLENDER ET AL., "The olfactory receptor universe - from whole genome analysis to structure and evolution", GENETICS AND MOLECULAR RESEARCH, (2004), vol. 3, no. 4, pages 545 - 553 | [A] - YOAV GILAD ET AL., "Population differences in the human functional olfactory repertoire", MOLECULAR BIOLOGY AND EVOLUTION, (2003), vol. 20, no. 3, pages 307 - 314, XP008124490 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/molbev/msg013 | [A] - DROR S. ET AL., "Identification and characterization of coding SNPs within a human olfactory receptor gene cluster", GENE, (2000), vol. 260, pages 97 - 94 | [XP] - KELLER A. ET AL., "Genetic variation in a human odorant receptor alters odour perception", NATURE, (20070927), vol. 449, pages 468 - 472, XP008124565 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature06162 | [XP] - ADLER E.M., "What awful smell?", SCIENCE SIGNALING STKE, (20071002), vol. 2007, no. 406, page TW352, XP008124566 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/stke.4062007tw352 |