EP2160929 - LOW-PROFILE SIGNAL DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING COLOR-CODED SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seegrid Corporation 216 RIDC Park West Drive Pittsburgh, PA 15275 / US | [2012/29] |
Former [2010/10] | For all designated states Seegrid Corporation Ninety One 43rd Street Suite 210 Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEISS, Mitchell 523 Brook Street Carlisle, Massachusetts 01741 / US | [2010/10] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/15] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/10] | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co. LLP St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road GB-Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08770632.1 | 11.06.2008 | [2010/10] | WO2008US66473 | Priority number, date | US20070760859 | 11.06.2007 Original published format: US 760859 | [2010/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008154557 | Date: | 18.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2160929 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2160929 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.02.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H05B37/02, G08B7/06, G08B5/36 | [2011/38] | CPC: |
G08B5/36 (EP,US);
F21S8/00 (EP,US);
G08B7/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/10] | H05B37/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/10] | Title | German: | NIEDRIGPROFILSIGNALVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON FARBCODIERTEN SIGNALEN | [2010/10] | English: | LOW-PROFILE SIGNAL DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING COLOR-CODED SIGNALS | [2010/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SIGNAUX DISCRETS ET PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION DE SIGNAUX À CODE DE COULEUR | [2010/10] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2009 | Search fee paid | 07.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/10] | 20.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.06.2008 | AT | 19.12.2012 | BE | 19.12.2012 | CY | 19.12.2012 | CZ | 19.12.2012 | DK | 19.12.2012 | EE | 19.12.2012 | FI | 19.12.2012 | HR | 19.12.2012 | IT | 19.12.2012 | LT | 19.12.2012 | LV | 19.12.2012 | MC | 19.12.2012 | MT | 19.12.2012 | NL | 19.12.2012 | PL | 19.12.2012 | RO | 19.12.2012 | SE | 19.12.2012 | SI | 19.12.2012 | SK | 19.12.2012 | TR | 19.12.2012 | BG | 19.03.2013 | NO | 19.03.2013 | GR | 20.03.2013 | ES | 30.03.2013 | IS | 19.04.2013 | PT | 19.04.2013 | IE | 11.06.2013 | LU | 11.06.2013 | CH | 30.06.2013 | LI | 30.06.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
IT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
MC | 19.12.2012 | ||
MT | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
TR | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
IE | 11.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
IT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
MC | 19.12.2012 | ||
MT | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
IE | 11.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
IT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
MC | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
IE | 11.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
IT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
MC | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
IT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 19.12.2012 | |
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | BE | 19.12.2012 | |
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | BE | 19.12.2012 | |
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 19.12.2012 | |
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 19.12.2012 | |
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 19.12.2012 | |
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 19.12.2012 | |
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 19.12.2012 | |
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 19.12.2012 | |
NO | 19.03.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE9404472U (SIEMENS NIXDORF INF SYST [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-14 * the whole document * * page 1, line 27 - page 2, line 5 * * page 2, line 20 - page 2, line 29 * * page 3, line 5 - page 3, line 15 * * page 3, line 26 - page 3, line 29 * * page 3, line 31 - page 4, line 2 * * page 4, line 4 - page 4, line 13; figure 1 * [Y] 4; | [A]US2005237735 (FAN EAGLE [TW]) [A] 2,4 * abstract * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0028]; figure 3 *; | [X]WO2006015255 (BARD RONALD [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5 * paragraphs [0021] - [0023] *; | [Y]EP1713044 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 4 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0003] - [0006] - [0018] , [0019] - [0021] - [0025] , [0026]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO2004104953 (LUMITEX PTY LTD [AU], et al) [A] 4,6 * page 5 - page 6; figures 1-7 *; | [A]US2006232962 (ALTMAN BRADFORD [US]) [A] 1,4,7-10 * paragraphs [0027] , [0028] , [0033] , [0038] , [0046]; figures 1,2; claim 1 * | International search | [X]KR20030064712 (SONG YONG TAE [KR]); | [Y]KR20050070491 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [X]KR200364841Y ; | [A]KR20060090095 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US2003030567 (HETZEL WILLIAM HIEBY [US], et al) | by applicant | DE9404472U |