EP2174296 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REALISTIC SIMULATION OF WRINKLE AGING AND DE-AGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2019/30] |
Former [2010/15] | For all designated states The Procter and Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HILLEBRAND, Greg 346 Shoshone Court Wyoming, Ohio 45215 / US | 02 /
DEMIRLI, Ramazan 1301 Grandview Court Whippany, New Jersey 07981 / US | [2010/15] | Representative(s) | P&G Patent Belgium UK N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/30] | Engisch, Gautier NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA IP Patent Department Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | ||
Former [2013/11] | Engisch, Gautier NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA IP Patent Department Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | ||
Former [2012/39] | Simpson, Kirsty Mairi Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited, Patent Department Rusham Park, Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | ||
Former [2010/15] | Wilding, Richard Alan Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Ltd Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | Application number, filing date | 08771487.9 | 19.06.2008 | [2010/15] | WO2008US67516 | Priority number, date | US20070951313P | 23.07.2007 Original published format: US 951313 P | US20080141457 | 18.06.2008 Original published format: US 141457 | [2010/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009014832 | Date: | 29.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2174296 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2174296 | Date: | 24.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/33, G06T11/60 | [2019/04] | CPC: |
G06T7/33 (EP,US);
G06T11/60 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20021 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30088 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30201 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/15] | G06T11/60, G06T7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/30] |
Former [2010/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR REALISTISCHEN SIMULATION VON FALTENALTERUNG UND ENTALTERUNG | [2010/15] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REALISTIC SIMULATION OF WRINKLE AGING AND DE-AGING | [2010/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT UNE SIMULATION RÉALISTE DU VIEILLISSEMENT ET DU RAJEUNISSEMENT DES RIDES | [2010/15] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/15] | 20.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.12.2012 | 06.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.06.2008 | AT | 24.07.2019 | CY | 24.07.2019 | CZ | 24.07.2019 | DK | 24.07.2019 | EE | 24.07.2019 | ES | 24.07.2019 | FI | 24.07.2019 | HR | 24.07.2019 | IT | 24.07.2019 | LT | 24.07.2019 | LV | 24.07.2019 | MC | 24.07.2019 | MT | 24.07.2019 | NL | 24.07.2019 | PL | 24.07.2019 | RO | 24.07.2019 | SE | 24.07.2019 | SI | 24.07.2019 | SK | 24.07.2019 | TR | 24.07.2019 | BG | 24.10.2019 | NO | 24.10.2019 | GR | 25.10.2019 | IS | 24.11.2019 | PT | 25.11.2019 | [2022/27] |
Former [2021/12] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 24.07.2019 | |
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 24.07.2019 | |
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | NL | 24.07.2019 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4276570 (BURSON NANCY, et al) [X] 1-7,10 * abstract * * column 1, lines 43-50,65 - column 2, lines 13,22-54 * * column 3, lines 34-65 * * column 4, lines 19,63 - column 5, line 13 * * column 6, lines 17-40 *; | [A]US6094202 (ROUET CHRISTIAN [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * abstract * * column 1, lines 33-43 * * column 2, lines 9-14,62FF * * column 4, lines 18-25 *; | [A]EP1216658 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-25 * abstract ** paragraphs [0047] - [0052] - [0078] , [0100] - [0103] - [0118] - [0123] *; | [A]US2005248582 (SCHEEPERS FERDI [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0010] , [0013] - [0015] - [0041] , [0042] , [0047] , [0075] , [0084] *; | [X]US2006274071 (BAZIN ROLAND [FR]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0025] - [0027] - [0095] * * abstract * |