EP2170427 - DIALYSIS CASSETTE HAVING MULTIPLE OUTLET VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2016 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baxter International Inc. One Baxter Parkway Deerfield, IL 60015-4633 / US | For all designated states Baxter Healthcare S.A. Thurgauerstrasse 130 8152 Glattpark (Opfikon) / CH | [2015/32] |
Former [2010/14] | For all designated states Baxter International Inc. One Baxter Parkway Deerfield, IL 60015-4633 / US | ||
For all designated states Baxter Healthcare SA Hertistrasse 2 Wallisellen 8304 Zurich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STECK, John 2551 W. Magnolia Lane Round Lake, Illinois 60073 / US | 02 /
REITZ, Douglas 1635 Carriage Court Green Oaks, Illinois 60048 / US | [2010/14] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/40] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham, NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2013/37] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2010/14] | Dee, Ian Mark Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 08772338.3 | 02.07.2008 | [2010/14] | WO2008US68974 | Priority number, date | US20070773654 | 05.07.2007 Original published format: US 773654 | [2010/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009006504 | Date: | 08.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2170427 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2170427 | Date: | 30.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/28 | [2010/14] | CPC: |
A61M1/28 (EP,US);
A61M1/155 (EP,US);
A61M1/1561 (EP,US);
A61M1/1565 (EP,US);
A61M1/1524 (EP,US);
A61M2205/128 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/40] |
Former [2010/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIALYSEKASSETTE MIT VENTIL MIT MEHREREN AUSGÄNGEN | [2010/14] | English: | DIALYSIS CASSETTE HAVING MULTIPLE OUTLET VALVE | [2010/14] | French: | CASSETTE DE DIALYSE AYANT UNE SOUPAPE À SORTIES MULTIPLES | [2010/14] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 16.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 01.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.07.2008 | AT | 30.09.2015 | BE | 30.09.2015 | BG | 30.09.2015 | CY | 30.09.2015 | CZ | 30.09.2015 | DK | 30.09.2015 | EE | 30.09.2015 | ES | 30.09.2015 | FI | 30.09.2015 | HR | 30.09.2015 | IT | 30.09.2015 | LT | 30.09.2015 | LV | 30.09.2015 | MC | 30.09.2015 | NL | 30.09.2015 | PL | 30.09.2015 | RO | 30.09.2015 | SE | 30.09.2015 | SI | 30.09.2015 | SK | 30.09.2015 | TR | 30.09.2015 | NO | 30.12.2015 | GR | 31.12.2015 | IS | 30.01.2016 | PT | 01.02.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 02.07.2008 | |
AT | 30.09.2015 | ||
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
CY | 30.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
TR | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 02.07.2008 | |
AT | 30.09.2015 | ||
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
CY | 30.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
TR | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 02.07.2008 | |
AT | 30.09.2015 | ||
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
CY | 30.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 30.09.2015 | |
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 30.09.2015 | |
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 30.09.2015 | |
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 30.09.2015 | |
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 30.09.2015 | |
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 30.09.2015 | |
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 30.09.2015 | |
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 30.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5062774 (KRAMER DAVID E [US], et al) [A] * figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]EP1201264 (FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE DE GMBH [DE]) [A] * figure -; claim 1 *; | [X]US6416293 (BOUCHARD CLEMENT D [US], et al) [X] 1-30 * paragraphs [0174] , [0175] , [0181] , [0182]; figures 11a-11f *; | [A]WO2005042065 (BAXTER INT [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * page 9, line 18 - page 10, line 4; figures 7,8 * |