EP2160266 - Thick-walled metal workpieces connecting method using welding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/10] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONNECTING THICK-WALLED METAL WORKPIECES BY WELDING | ||
[2015/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vallourec Deutschland GmbH Theodorstraße 109 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | [2014/26] |
Former [2014/03] | For all designated states Vallourec Deutschland GmbH Theodorstraße 90 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2010/10] | For all designated states V & M Deutschland GmbH Rather Kreuzweg 106 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KEITEL, Steffen Hoher Weg 14 06120 Halle / DE | 02 /
NEUBERT, Jan Mozartstrasse 1 06114 Halle / DE | 03 /
SCHELLER, Wolfgang Mörterfeld 60 47918 Tönisvorst / DE | 04 /
LIEDTKE, Markus Brambauerstrasse 235 45731 Waltrop / DE | 05 /
CAESAR, Christian Friedenstrasse 7a 46244 Bottrop / DE | [2010/10] | Representative(s) | Meissner, Peter E. Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Hohenzollerndamm 89 14199 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/31] | Meissner, Peter E. Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Hohenzollerndamm 89 14199 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2010/10] | Meissner, Peter E. Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Hohenzollerndamm 89 14199 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 08773276.4 | 26.06.2008 | [2010/10] | WO2008DE01063 | Priority number, date | DE20071030050 | 26.06.2007 Original published format: DE102007030050 | DE20081029724 | 24.06.2008 Original published format: DE102008029724 | [2010/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009000259 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2009/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2160266 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2160266 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/14, B23K26/26, B23K26/30 | [2010/10] | CPC: |
B23K33/006 (EP,US);
B23K26/282 (EP,US);
B23K26/348 (EP);
B23K9/0282 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/31] |
Former [2010/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Verbinden dickwandiger metallischer Werkstücke mittels Schweissen | [2015/10] | English: | Thick-walled metal workpieces connecting method using welding | [2015/10] | French: | Procédé d'assemblage par soudure de pièces métalliques à parois épaisses | [2015/11] |
Former [2010/10] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERBINDEN DICKWANDIGER METALLISCHER WERKSTÜCKE MITTELS SCHWEISSEN | ||
Former [2010/10] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONNECTING THICK-WALLED METAL WORKPIECES BY WELDING | ||
Former [2010/10] | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR ASSEMBLER PAR SOUDURE DES PIÈCES MÉTALLIQUES À PAROI ÉPAISSE | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/10] | 13.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.06.2008 | BG | 29.07.2015 | CY | 29.07.2015 | CZ | 29.07.2015 | DK | 29.07.2015 | EE | 29.07.2015 | ES | 29.07.2015 | FI | 29.07.2015 | HR | 29.07.2015 | IT | 29.07.2015 | LT | 29.07.2015 | LV | 29.07.2015 | MC | 29.07.2015 | MT | 29.07.2015 | NL | 29.07.2015 | PL | 29.07.2015 | RO | 29.07.2015 | SE | 29.07.2015 | SI | 29.07.2015 | SK | 29.07.2015 | TR | 29.07.2015 | NO | 29.10.2015 | GR | 30.10.2015 | IS | 29.11.2015 | PT | 30.11.2015 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 26.06.2008 | |
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
MT | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
TR | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 26.06.2008 | |
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
TR | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 26.06.2008 | |
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | DK | 29.07.2015 | |
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | DK | 29.07.2015 | |
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | ES | 29.07.2015 | |
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 29.07.2015 | |
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 29.07.2015 | |
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 29.07.2015 | |
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 29.07.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2634577 (ANSALDO SPA [IT]) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [AY]EP1160046 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [A] 1,2,6-8,13 * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0027]; figure 3 * [Y] 5; | [XDY]WO2005056230 (VIETZ GMBH [DE], et al) [XD] 1-3,6-9,14 * page 19, line 23 - line 26 * * page 23, paragraph L - page 24, paragraph 1 * * page 30, line 14 - line 23 * * page 21, line 6 - line 11 * [Y] 5; | [AP]EP1900472 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR], et al) [AP] 1-17 * paragraph [0024] * |